Breeding v. U.S. Department of Interior

Plaintiff: Darice Breeding
Defendant: U.S. Department of Interior
Case Number: 2:2014cv00948
Filed: April 26, 2014
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Tangipahoa
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 21, 2015 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting in part, denying in part 52 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 4/21/2015.(blg)
September 29, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting in part, denying in part 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 9/29/2014.(blg)
August 27, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Vacating Case Referral to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 8/27/2014.(blg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breeding v. U.S. Department of Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darice Breeding
Represented By: John-Michael Lawrence(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?