Gahagan v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Plaintiff: Michael W. Gahagan
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 2:2014cv01268
Filed: June 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Presiding Judge: Sally Shushan
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER & REASONS: ORDERED that Plaintiff's Second Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs (Rec. Doc. 42) is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Reply (Rec. Doc. 44) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 11/4/15. (sek)
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER & REASONS: ORDERED that Plaintiff's Second Motion for Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 34) and Third Motion for Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 35) are DENIED. Plaintiff's Motions for Leave to File Reply (Rec. Docs. 38, 39) are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/11/15. (sek)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER AND REASONS. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's 28 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs is DENIED. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 9/30/2014. (gec)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER & REASONS: denying 8 Motion for Summary Judgment; FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's complaint in this matter is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 8/14/14. (sek)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gahagan v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Gahagan
Represented By: Michael Wayne Gahagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?