Biyiklioglu v. St. Tammany Parish Jail et al
Plaintiff: |
Giray C. Biyiklioglu |
Defendant: |
St. Tammany Parish Jail, U.S. Marshal, Nico Paternostro, David J Horchar, Jack Strain and Genny May |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv01684 |
Filed: |
July 21, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana |
Office: |
New Orleans Office |
County: |
St Tammany |
Presiding Judge: |
Lance M Africk |
Presiding Judge: |
Daniel E. Knowles |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 24, 2016 |
Filing
101
ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that the 97 motion to amend judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2), the Warden of FCI Oakdale I shall withhold 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to the p laintiff's prisoner account and forward payments to the Clerk of Court when the balance in the account exceeds $10. This order shall continue until the full balance of $800.34 is collected from plaintiff's prisoner account or the plaintiff is transferred or released from the custody of the Bureau of Prisons. FURTHER ORDERED that, if plaintiff is transferred to a another facility or is released from custody, the Warden shall notify the Court of plaintiff's new facility or forwarding address within 30 days of plaintiff's transfer or release. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/23/2016. (NEF: Financial Unit; cc: Warden) (blg)
|
January 13, 2016 |
Filing
96
ORDER denying 93 Motion to Vacate or for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/13/2016. (blg)
|
December 4, 2015 |
Filing
91
ORDERED that the 89 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED and that plaintiff's claims against defendants, Jack Strain, Nico Paternostro, and David J. Horchar, are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. FURTHER ORDERED that the matter is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 12/3/2015. (blg)
|
September 8, 2015 |
Filing
71
ORDER that plaintiff's 62 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint to add additional defendants is GRANTED, and the Clerk of Court is directed to refile record doc 62 into the record as an amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 9/8/15. (plh) Modified doc type on 9/8/2015 (plh).
|
June 29, 2015 |
Filing
51
ORDER ADOPTING PARTIAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 46 , granting 37 Motion to dismiss; plaintiff's claims against U.S. Marshal Genny May, the St. Tammany Parish Jail, and the U.S. Marshals Service are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 6/29/2015.(blg)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?