Snider v. New Hampshire Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Kandise Snider
Defendant: New Hampshire Insurance Company, Fidel Garcia, Johnny L Moore and JWK Enterprises Inc.
Case Number: 2:2014cv02132
Filed: September 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: St Tammany
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Presiding Judge: Sally Shushan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER granting 323 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). IT IS ORDERED that the motion for entry of a final judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 2/22/2017. (cg)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER AND REASONS denying 271 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 7/25/16. (cg)
June 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER re 172 Omnibus Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/14/2016. (bwn)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER & REASONS granting in part and denying in part 136 Motion in Limine to Strike Attempted Medical Diagnoses of Life Care Planner, Unsupported Life Care Plan Treatments, and Vocational Rehabilitation Opinion by JWK Enterprises, Johnny Moore, Occidental Fire & Casualty Insurance Company of North Carolina. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 6/9/2016. (mmm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snider v. New Hampshire Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kandise Snider
Represented By: William Roy Mustian, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Hampshire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidel Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny L Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JWK Enterprises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?