Pershing LLC v. Kiebach et al
Plaintiff: Pershing LLC
Defendant: Margaret Dumestre, Mamie Helen Baumann, Joseph Becker, AmeriTrust Corporation, Terence Beven, Linda Boyd, Jerry Burris, Anita Carter, Jim Chisholm, Patrick Comeaux, Kevin Courville, Monica Courville, Carolyn Daniel, Kenneth Daniel, William Dawson, Fred Demarest, Cindy Dore, Leah Farr, Martin Fischer, Kendall Forbes, May Giambrone, Lynn Gildersleeve, Jon Goeckel, Loretta Goeckel, Jason Graham, Robert Graham, Charles Gruenwald, Charles Hart, Patsy Hebert, Donald Kenaley, Thomas Kiebach, Don Landers, Daniel Landry, Dianna Landry, Merrill LaPlante, Ruth Lessing, Gregory Magee, Ronald Marston, Jean Anne Mayhall, Microchip ID Systems Pension Fund, Jacqueline Millet, Arthur Ordoyne, Bennie O'Rear, Claudia O'Rear, Mary Ann Paternostro, Lynn Philippe, Power Packing Co. Inc. Agency, Richard Rathbone, James Roland, Susan Roland, Jessie Romig, Julie Savoy, Robert Schwendimann, Bruce Smith, Harriet Smith, Robert Smith, Rodney Starkey, James Stegall, Carol Stegall, Walter Bruce Stone, Terry Tarver, Lewis Unglesby, Gail Unglesby, John Wade, Charles White, Kenneth Wilkewitz, Stephen Wilson, Martha Witmer, Sharon Witmer, Bobby Nix, Margaret Nix, Kathleen Melilli, Robert Gildersleeve, Mallory D'Amore, Ralph D'Amore, Royce Beauchamp, Roderick Danielson, Wallace DeHay, Cindy Gentry, Tommy Gentry, Gordon Gill, Nancy Gill, Barney Hallman, John Hutcherson, Kirk Oliver, Mary Oliver, Monroe Rathbone, Marcel Dumestre, Patrick Haney, Lonnie Ordoyne and G. Rogers Smith
Case Number: 2:2014cv02549
Filed: November 7, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09:1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER AND REASONS granting 151 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Pershing LLC; denying 154 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Louisiana Retirees. FURTHER ORDERED that the decision of the arbitration panel in favor of Pershing LLC and against the Louisiana Retirees is CONFIRMED. Pershing LLC shall provide the Court with a proposed judgment no later than 5/25/2017 at Noon. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 5/22/2017.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that Pershing's 133 objections are DENIED and that Pershing is ORDERED to immediately comply with the Magistrate Judge's 132 discovery order. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk. (Reference: All Cases)(bwn)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER AND REASONS re Privilege Logs and Associated Documents of In Camera Review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 3/24/2017.(Reference: 14-2549)(bwn)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER AND REASONS denying 89 MOTION for APPEAL/REVIEW OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court re 85 Order on Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/15/2017.(Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDERED that the matter is hereby STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED pending the resolution of defendants' application for interlocutory appeal by the Fifth Circuit. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 4/28/2015.(blg)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER AND REASONS denying 23 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk. (lag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pershing LLC v. Kiebach et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Dumestre
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mamie Helen Baumann
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Becker
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmeriTrust Corporation
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terence Beven
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Boyd
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Burris
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anita Carter
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Chisholm
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Comeaux
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Courville
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Courville
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Daniel
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Daniel
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Dawson
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred Demarest
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Dore
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leah Farr
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Fischer
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kendall Forbes
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: May Giambrone
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Gildersleeve
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Goeckel
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta Goeckel
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Graham
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Graham
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Gruenwald
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Hart
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patsy Hebert
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Kenaley
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Kiebach
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Landers
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Landry
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dianna Landry
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill LaPlante
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Lessing
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Magee
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Marston
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Anne Mayhall
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microchip ID Systems Pension Fund
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Millet
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Ordoyne
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bennie O'Rear
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claudia O'Rear
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann Paternostro
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Philippe
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Power Packing Co. Inc. Agency
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Rathbone
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Roland
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Roland
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessie Romig
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Savoy
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Schwendimann
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Smith
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harriet Smith
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Smith
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Starkey
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Stegall
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Stegall
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Bruce Stone
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Tarver
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Unglesby
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Unglesby
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Wade
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles White
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Wilkewitz
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Wilson
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Witmer
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Witmer
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Nix
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Nix
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Melilli
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gildersleeve
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallory D'Amore
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph D'Amore
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royce Beauchamp
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick Danielson
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wallace DeHay
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Gentry
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy Gentry
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Gill
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Gill
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barney Hallman
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Hutcherson
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirk Oliver
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Oliver
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monroe Rathbone
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcel Dumestre
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Haney
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonnie Ordoyne
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Rogers Smith
Represented By: Crystal DiBenedetto Burkhalter
Represented By: Jennifer Rae Dietz
Represented By: Charles Malcolm Gordon
Represented By: John N. Grinton
Represented By: Caroline Preis
Represented By: Phillip W. Preis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pershing LLC
Represented By: Katie Deranger Bell
Represented By: Lana Davis Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?