Olivier v. Cain et al
Plaintiff: |
Ronald Olivier |
Defendant: |
N. Burl Cain |
Respondent: |
Attorney General State of Louisiana |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv02773 |
Filed: |
December 9, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana |
Office: |
New Orleans Office |
County: |
West Feliciana |
Presiding Judge: |
Lance M Africk |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph C. Wilkinson |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 3, 2016 |
Filing
41
ORDER AND REASONS ADOPTING 37 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the State's 38 objections are OVERRULED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner Ronald Olivier's application for habeas corpus relief is GRANTED, that hi s sentence of life imprisonment without benefit of probation, parole or suspension of sentence is VACATED, and that the state trial court is ORDERED to resentence Petitioner in conformity with Miller v. Alabama, 132 S.Ct. 2455 (2012), within ninety (90) days or, in the alternative, to release him from confinement. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/3/2016.(mmv)
|
June 18, 2015 |
Filing
26
ORDER AND REASONS : ORDERED that Olivier's Motion to Stay Proceedings, Record Doc. 20 , is GRANTED. Further proceedings addressing Olivier's petition for issuance of a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254 are hereby STAYED. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the case for all administrative and statistical purposes. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Olivier and defense counsel must notify this court in writing immediately upon resolution of the questions accepted by the Supre me Court on writ of certiorari in Montgomery v. Louisiana, 135 S. Ct. 1546 (2015). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that either party may move to re-open this matter within thirty (30) days of resolution of the questions accepted by the Supreme Court on writ of certiorari in Montgomery v. Louisiana, 135 S. Ct. 1546 (2015). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 6/18/2015. (my)(NEF:NJB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?