Grand Isle Shipyards, Inc. v. Black Elk Offshore Operations, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: |
Grand Isle Shipyards, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Black Elk Energy Offshore Operations, L.L.C. |
Counter_claimant: |
Black Elk Energy Offshore Operations, L.L.C. |
Counter_defendant: |
Grand Isle Shipyards, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00129 |
Filed: |
January 21, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana |
Office: |
New Orleans Office |
County: |
Lafourche |
Presiding Judge: |
Nannette Jolivette Brown |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael North |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 14, 2021 |
Filing
374
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 363 Motion in Limine is GRANTED insomuch as BEEOO seeks to exclude the broad category of any document filed by GIS and/or BEEOO in any lawsuit. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that BEEOO's Motion is DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 5/14/2021. (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
|
March 17, 2021 |
Filing
359
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 355 Motion to Modify Order Granting BEEOO's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Reduction of Damages Pursuant to La. Civ. Code Article 2003 [Rec. 329] To Certify For Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) is DENIED as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 3/17/2021. (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
|
March 3, 2021 |
Filing
350
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 237 Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as set forth herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 229 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Recovery of Unpaid Invoices is G RANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as set forth herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 180 Motion in Limine to Exclude Summary Evidence Under Federal Rule of Evidence 1006 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 3/3/2021. (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
|
February 23, 2021 |
Filing
341
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 252 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 2/23/2021. (Reference: All Cases)(jeg) Modified text on 2/23/2021 (mmv).
|
February 22, 2021 |
Filing
339
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 256 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED to strike Contested Issue of Law No. 7 from the Proposed Pretrial Order. The Motion is DENIED in all other aspects as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 2/22/2021. (Reference: All Cases)(jeg) Modified text on 2/22/2021 (mmv).
|
February 12, 2021 |
Filing
337
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 255 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 2/12/2021. (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
|
May 11, 2020 |
Filing
318
ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 249 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 5/11/2020. (Reference: All Cases)(jeg)
|
August 23, 2019 |
Filing
225
ORDER AND REASONS DENYING 97 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, as set forth in document. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/23/2019. (Reference: All Cases)(jls)
|
July 23, 2019 |
Filing
195
ORDER denying 122 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on July 22, 2019. (Reference: 15-129)(mp)
|
July 22, 2019 |
Filing
194
ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Grand Isle Shipyard, Inc.'s 125 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED, as set forth in document. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/22/2019. (Reference: 15-129)(jls)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?