Petroplex International, LLC et al v. St. James Parish et al
Plaintiff: |
Petroplex International, LLC, Mainline Energy Partners No. 2, LLC and Homeplace Ventures No. 2, LLC |
Defendant: |
St. James Parish, Ryan Donadieu and Timothy Roussel |
Case Number: |
2:2015cv00140 |
Filed: |
January 22, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana |
Office: |
New Orleans Office |
County: |
East Baton Rouge |
Presiding Judge: |
Jane Triche Milazzo |
Presiding Judge: |
Karen Wells Roby |
Nature of Suit: |
Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2201 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 5, 2016 |
Filing
157
ORDER AND REASONS DENYING 25 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 5/5/2016. (my)
|
February 2, 2016 |
Filing
148
ORDER: ORDERED that 82 Motion to Compel is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS GRANTED as to the documents that the Court held are not privileged. The documents that correspond to the listed Bates numbers are not privileged. FURTHER GRANT ED as to documents that correspond to the following Bates numbers were blank pages and thus not privileged: 11806, 22494, 22742. IT IS DENIED as to the documents that the Court held are privileged. The documents that correspond to the listed Bates numbers are privileged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cml)
|
February 1, 2016 |
Filing
145
ORDER: ORDERED that the 73 Motion to Compel is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. GRANTED as to the documents that the Court held are not privileged. The documents that correspond to the listed Bates numbers are not privileged. FURTHER GRANTED as to documents that correspond to the following Bates numbers were blank pages and thus not privileged: 56, 2279, 3490, 3787, 3617, 7965.IT IS DENIED as to the documents that the Court held are privileged. The documents that correspond to the listed Bates numbers are privileged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cml)
|
January 29, 2016 |
Filing
143
ORDER: ORDERED that the 127 Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (NEF:MILAZZO) (cml)
|
January 28, 2016 |
Filing
141
ORDER: ORDERED that 135 Motion to Expedite Hearing is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 134 Motion to Quash Deposition of Bengt Jarlsjo and Verwater USA Projects, LLC is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED AS MOOT IN PART. IT IS GRANTED as to the Notice of 30(b)(6) Deposition of Verwater U.S.A. Projects, L.L.C. IT IS DENIED AS MOOT as to the deposition of Bengt Jarlsjo of Quanta Capital Solutions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby.(cc:MILAZZO) (cml)
|
January 25, 2016 |
Filing
130
ORDER AND REASONS granting in part 60 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on the Constitutionality of St. James Parish Ordinance 14-03. Plaintiffs' federal constitutional claims challenging the validity of the Land Use Ordinance are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and Plaintiffs' state law challenges to the ordinance are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
|
October 19, 2015 |
Filing
71
ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiffs' individual-capacity claims against Parish Council Members Alvin St. Pierre, Jason Amato, Terry McCrear y, Ralph Patin, Charles Ketchens, Ken Brass, and James Brazen are DISMISSED. Plaintiffs' official-capacity claims against Parish President Timothy Roussel; Parish Planning/Permitting Supervisor Ryan Donadieu; and Parish Council Members Alvin St. Pierre, Jason Amato, Terry McCreary, Ralph Patin, Charles Ketchens, Ken Brass, and James Brazen are likewise DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ecm)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?