Fairley et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ravion Fairley, Carasha Isaac and Yalile Leal
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2015cv00462
Filed: February 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's 241 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Request for a New Trial is DENIED. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 7/18/2017. (mmv)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER DENYING 188 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Her Employment After 2005. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 11/7/2016. (mmv)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's 54 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED considering that Plaintiff has not contested Defendant's arguments, Defendant's motion is GRANTE D to the extent that Plaintiffs claims occurring before December 26, 1998, are time-barred. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's motion is DENIED because the Court finds that Plaintiff has pointed to sufficient evidence supporting Plaintiff� 39;s assertion that her claims arising since December 26, 1998, are not procedurally barred or time-barred. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's motion is DENIED because material issues of fact are in dispute regarding whether Plaintiff has asserted a valid claim for discrimination. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/31/2016. (mmv)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER denying 53 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 8/19/2016. (mmm)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDERED that 70 Motion for Reconsideration the Courts Order Entered April 29, 2016 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cml)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fairley et al v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ravion Fairley
Represented By: Kate Ann Fisher
Represented By: Jason Paul Hungerford
Represented By: James Harvey Kaster
Represented By: Matthew Hale Morgan
Represented By: Adrienne Danielle Rachel
Represented By: J. Arthur Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carasha Isaac
Represented By: Kate Ann Fisher
Represented By: Jason Paul Hungerford
Represented By: James Harvey Kaster
Represented By: Matthew Hale Morgan
Represented By: Adrienne Danielle Rachel
Represented By: J. Arthur Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yalile Leal
Represented By: Kate Ann Fisher
Represented By: Jason Paul Hungerford
Represented By: James Harvey Kaster
Represented By: Matthew Hale Morgan
Represented By: Adrienne Danielle Rachel
Represented By: J. Arthur Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Paul Beiser
Represented By: Susanne U. Veters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?