Benson v. Rosenthal
Plaintiff: Thomas Milton Benson, Jr.
Defendant: Robert A. Rosenthal
Case Number: 2:2015cv00782
Filed: March 10, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER AND REASONS denying 238 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER AND REASONS GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART AND DISMISSING AS MOOT IN PART 112 Motion to Compel as set forth in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 5/25/2016. (my)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER AND REASONS denying 54 , 55 Motions for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER AND REASONS GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 70 MOTION to Compel Benson; New Orleans Louisiana Saints, LLC; and Louisiana Media, Inc. to Produce Responsive Documents, 85 MOTION for Discovery Sequencing Order, and for Protective Order , 86 MOTION for Discovery Sequencing Order as set forth in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 3/16/2016.(my)
October 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER AND REASONS denying Mary R. Rowe's 50 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
July 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER AND REASONS DENYING 14 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 7/8/2015. (my)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benson v. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Milton Benson, Jr.
Represented By: Matthew S. Almon
Represented By: James C. Gulotta, Jr.
Represented By: Phillip A. Wittmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?