Nautimill S.A. v. Legacy Marine Transportation, LLC
Plaintiff: Nautimill S.A.
Defendant: Legacy Marine Transportation, LLC
Case Number: 2:2015cv01065
Filed: April 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of Country
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Presiding Judge: Sarah S. Vance
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - the Courtfinds that Nautimill is entitled to recover the following from Legacy in the amount of $240,000.00. In addition, Nautimill is entitled to recover attorney's fees. Counsel for Nautimill are hereby ORDERED to, within five days of the entry of judgment, submit to the Court a sworn affidavit detailing their fees in accordance with Local Rule 54.2. Finally, the Court finds Hasselman not liable for the claims in Legacy's third party complaint, and Legacy not liable for Hasselman'scounterclaims.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/4/16.(jjs)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER AND REASONS granting 91 Michael J. Thompson, Jr.'s motion to quash Legacy Marine Transportation, LLC's trial subpoena.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/18/16. (jjs)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER AND REASONS re: Defendant Legacy Marine Transportation, LLC MOTION for summary judgment on all of plaintiff Nautimill S.A.'s claims 49 and, MOTION for summary judgment 50 on all of David Hasselman and International Marine Sales and Export, LLC's counterclaims. The Court DENIES Legacy's motion for summary judgment on Nautimill's claims for fraudulent misrepresentation, negligent misrepresentation, and redhibition. The Court GRANTS Legacy's motion for sum mary judgment on Nautimill's claims for breach of the warranty of fitness for ordinary use and breach of contract. The Court DENIES Legacy's motion for summary judgment on IMSE and Hasselman's counterclaims for lost commission on th e sale of the Legacy Server and dismisses IMSE and Hasselman's counterclaims regarding damage to UTB #41440 for lack of jurisdiction, and therefore DENIES AS MOOT Legacy's motion for summary judgment on the same claim.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 7/7/16. (jjs)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER AND REASONS denying 24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 12/2/15. (jjs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nautimill S.A. v. Legacy Marine Transportation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nautimill S.A.
Represented By: Iliaura Hands
Represented By: Machale Andrew Miller
Represented By: Ira Matthew Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Marine Transportation, LLC
Represented By: John A. Cangelosi
Represented By: Henry A. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?