Marshall v. Louisiana State et al
Plaintiff: Donald L Marshall, Jr.
Defendant: Louisiana State, Marlin N. Gusman and Law Enforcement District for the Parish of Orleans
Case Number: 2:2015cv01128
Filed: April 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Tangipahoa
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' 118 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 1/10/2017. (mmv)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 21 Motion to Certify Class/Motion to Produce. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (jrc)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Set Aside Default. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (jrc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. Louisiana State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald L Marshall, Jr.
Represented By: Douglass Evans Alongia
Represented By: Raymond Joseph Brinson
Represented By: Brian L. Glorioso
Represented By: Richard Alvin Tonry, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlin N. Gusman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Law Enforcement District for the Parish of Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?