Dorsey v. United Rentals North America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Edward Dorsey, Jr.
Defendant: United Rentals North America, Inc.
Third_party_plaintiff: United Rentals North America, Inc.
Third_party_defendant: P.R. Skate, LLC and Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2015cv01528
Filed: May 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: Helen G. Berrigan
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER AND REASONS denying 366 Motion for Leave to File a Complaint in Intervention. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 6/9/2017. (Reference: 15-1528)(clc)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Arch's 220 Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to the Declaratory Judgment and Cross-Claim of the P.R. Skate, L.L.C. is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Arch's motion is GRANTED to the extent t hat it seeks summary judgment on the issue of whether it has a duty to defend P.R. Skate against Plaintiff's claims for bodily injury. It does not. Arch's motion is DENIED in all other respects. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that P.R. Skate's 155 Motion for Summary Judgment of Liability Against Arch Specialty Insurance Company is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. P.R. Skate's motion is GRANTED to the extent that it seeks summary judgment on its claim that Arch breached its contract by failing to defend United Rentals and Wal-Mart under the Blanket Additional Insured Endorsement. P.R. Skates motion is DENIED in allother respects. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 2/15/2017. (Reference: All Cases)(mmv)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER denying 171 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 187 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (Reference: as listed)(jrc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorsey v. United Rentals North America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Dorsey, Jr.
Represented By: Salvador I. Bivalacqua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Rentals North America, Inc.
Represented By: C. Michael Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_plaintiff: United Rentals North America, Inc.
Represented By: C. Michael Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: P.R. Skate, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?