Adams v. City of New Orleans, et al
Plaintiff: Reginald Adams
Defendant: New Orleans City, Harry Connick, Leon Cannizzaro, Jr, Sam Gebbia, Martin Venezia, Frank Ruiz, Jerry Ursin, Ronald Bodenheimer and Unidentified Parties
Case Number: 2:2015cv01543
Filed: May 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Presiding Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, IT IS ORDERED that the 194 Motion to Quash Deposition of Subpoena for Michal Magner, Adams's Attorney of Record, or for a Protective Order is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 196 Motion for Leave to Fi le a Third Amended Complaint is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's 209 Motion to Compel Defendants to Provide Good-Faith Responses to Plaintiff's Court-Ordered Proposed Stipulations is DENIED. HOWEVER, and because the parties have already done so, the Court orders the parties to meet and confer in good faith one more time no later than ten (10) days from the date of this Order, and to continue their on-going efforts to resolve as many disputed issues before trial. All requests for fees and costs are denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III on 5/17/2017. (cms)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Minute Order. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III: Motions Hearing held on 2/23/2017 re 174 MOTION to Quash Subpoena, 180 MOTION to Supplement Motion to Quash Subpoena. IT IS ORDERED that the 174 Motion to Quash Subpoena and the Ex Parte 180 Motion to Supplement Motion to Quash Subpoena and to Seek a Protective Order are GRANTED IN PART and DISMISSED AS MOOT IN PART as outlined in document. (cms)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER AND REASONS denying 76 77 78 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, as per herein. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 8/12/16. (cg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. City of New Orleans, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reginald Adams
Represented By: Caitlin R. Cottingham
Represented By: Christopher M. Denig
Represented By: Benjamin S. Haley
Represented By: Michael William Magner
Represented By: Benjamin Schrier
Represented By: David Sneed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City
Represented By: Ewell Patrick Eagan
Represented By: Churita H. Hansell
Represented By: Kimlin Smith Lee
Represented By: Cherrell R. Simms
Represented By: Corwin St. Raymond
Represented By: Isaka R. Williams
Represented By: Sharonda R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Connick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Cannizzaro, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Gebbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Venezia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Ursin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Bodenheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?