Derischebourg v. Clark et al
Plaintiff: Alfred Derischebourg
Defendant: Chris Clark, John Herrin, David Cantrelle, Vicky Clark, Kristine Alarcon, Lambert C Boissiere, Jr, Harbor Police Department of the Port of New Orleans and Unidentified Parties
Case Number: 2:2015cv01712
Filed: May 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that Chris Clark Jr.'s 135 motion for summary judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Board of Commissioners of the Port of New Orleans's summary judgment 134 motion is GRANTED IN PART. Der ischebourg's Section 1983 claim against the Port is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The remainder of the Port's summary judgment motion is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Lexington Insurance Company's 130 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED and that all claims against Lexington are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 3/22/2017. (bwn)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff's 166 motion to file a third amended complaint is DENIED. The Constable and Cantrelle are deemed to have conclusively admitted that Cantrelle is an employee of the Constable. Neither defendant will be permitted to withdraw that admission. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's 169 motion to take the deposition of the Reserve Deputy Constable's Association is GRANTED. Plaintiff may take the deposition within fourteen days of this order. The parties should notify the Court via telephone no later than March 2, 2017 if they cannot amicably schedule the deposition. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk. (bwn)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that Clark's 22 motion to dismiss is GRANTED with respect to plaintiff's 1981 and 1985 claims and plaintiff's official-capacity claim against Clark, which claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. FURTH ER ORDERED that Clark's 22 motion is DENIED in all other respects. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's 31 motion for leave to amend the complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on or before 1/13/2016. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/8/2016. (blg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Derischebourg v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Derischebourg
Represented By: Ryan A. Jurkovic
Represented By: Isaac Harris Soileau, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Herrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Cantrelle
Represented By: Ike Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicky Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristine Alarcon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lambert C Boissiere, Jr
Represented By: Ike Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Police Department of the Port of New Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?