Sussmann et al v. Financial Guards, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Eddie Sussmann, Sr. and Leading Edge Financial Services, LLC
Defendant: Financial Guards, LLC and Daniel Dragan
Case Number: 2:2015cv02373
Filed: June 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18:1030
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER AND REASONS denying 134 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part 146 Motion for Reconsideration; granting in part 159 Motion to Vacate Judgment. The Court's prior order granting summary judgment on Plaintiffs' claims under the CFAA and LUTPA regarding Defendants access of Plaintiffs' telephone and email systems is REVERSED, those claims are REINSTATED, and shall be decided at trial. Any judgment issued with regards to those claims is VACATED. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER AND REASONS granting in part 55 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs are entitled to judgment on their claims against Defendant Daniel Dragan for violation of the CFAA, LUTSA, LUTPA, and state law conversion. Plaintiffs shall within 10 days of this Order submit a proposed order of permanent injunction consistent with this Order. Plaintiffs claim for trade dress infringement, as well as damages on its claims against Dragan and Financial Guards, shall be heard at the trial set for January 16, 2018. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm) Modified text on 10/30/2017 (ecm).
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDERED that 80 Motion for Protective Order to Require Deposition of Daniel Dragan Occur in Naples, Florida and, alternatively, to Require Deposition by Remote Means is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cml)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER AND REASONS denying 45 Motion for Relief from Judgment; denying 46 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDERED that 37 Motion to Appoint Counsel and 38 Amended Motion to Appoint Counsel are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cml)
December 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER AND REASONS STRIKING 12 Motion to Dismiss Party; GRANTING 20 Motion to Strike ; DENYING 16 Motion for Sanctions; DENYING 18 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/29/2015. (my)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sussmann et al v. Financial Guards, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Sussmann, Sr.
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin W. Janke
Represented By: Camalla M. Kimbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leading Edge Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: Steven F. Griffith, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin W. Janke
Represented By: Camalla M. Kimbrough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Guards, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Dragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?