Cain et al v. New Orleans City et al
Plaintiff: Alana Cain, Ashton Brown, Reynaud Variste, Reynajia Variste, Thaddeus Long and Vanessa Maxwell
Defendant: New Orleans City, Orleans Parish Criminal District Court, Marlin N. Gusman, Arthur A Morrell, Robert J. Kazik, Laurie A White, Tracey Flemings-Davillier, Benedict Willard, Dennis Waldron, Keva Landrum-Johnson, Robin Pittman, Byron C. Williams, Camille Buras, Karen K. Herman, Darryl Derbigny, Arthur Hunter, Franz Zibilich and Harry E Cantrell
Case Number: 2:2015cv04479
Filed: September 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Sarah S. Vance
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER AND REASONS granting 295 Motion for Summary Judgment and 296 Motion to Certify Class. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS defendants' motion for summary judgment on Count Six. Count Six is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Plaintif fs' motion for class certification is GRANTED. The following class is certified as to the first part of Count Five: all persons who owe or will incur court debts arising from cases adjudicated in OPCDC. The following subclass is also certified as to the second part of Count Five: all class members whose debts are at least partly owed to the OPCDC Judicial Expense Fund. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/2/2018. (Reference: All cases)(cg)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 250 and 251 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment on Count Five. The Court GRANTS defendants' mot ion for summary judgment on Counts One, Two, and Four. The parties' motions are otherwise DENIED. Counts One, Two, and Four are DISMISSED AS MOOT. Administrator Kazik is DISMISSED from this case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 12/13/2017. (Reference: 15-4479)(cg)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER & REASONS denying 220 MOTION for APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 3/7/2017. (mmm)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER AND REASONS - the Magistrate Judge's order is MODIFIED as follows. Plaintiffs' motion to amend is GRANTED as to the amendments regarding Counts Four and Seven against Sheriff Gusman. Plaintiffs' motion to amend is DENIED as to the amendments regarding: Counts One, Two, and Three against Sheriff Gusman; Claims against the City of New Orleans; Claims against Judicial Administrator Robert Kazik; Claims against Orleans Parish Criminal District Court. Plaintiffs' motion for extension of deadlines is DENIED AS MOOT. The Court will issue a new scheduling order separately after a status conference with all counsel. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/3/17. (NEF: Mag 2) (jjs)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER AND REASONS DENYING 185 Motion for Protective Order; GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 192 Motion to Compel as set forth in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 12/8/2016. (mmv) (NEF: J. Vance)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER & REASONS denying 97 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/23/2016. (mmm)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting 58 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Party New Orleans City dismissed. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/13/2016. (mmm)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER AND REASONS denying 108 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/11/16. (jjs)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part defendants' motion 54 to dismiss on grounds of absolute and qualified immunity.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 5/3/16. (jjs)
April 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER AND REASONS denying 53 Motion to Dismiss for failure to join indispensable parties.. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/22/16. (jjs)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER AND REASONS denying 52 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/21/16. (jjs)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER AND REASONS regarding 59 Motion to Take Judicial Notice. See document for specific ruling. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 12/2/15. (jjs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cain et al v. New Orleans City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alana Cain
Represented By: Alec George Karakatsanis
Represented By: Anna Lise Lellelid-Douffet
Represented By: William Patrick Quigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashton Brown
Represented By: Alec George Karakatsanis
Represented By: Anna Lise Lellelid-Douffet
Represented By: William Patrick Quigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynaud Variste
Represented By: Alec George Karakatsanis
Represented By: Anna Lise Lellelid-Douffet
Represented By: William Patrick Quigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reynajia Variste
Represented By: Alec George Karakatsanis
Represented By: Anna Lise Lellelid-Douffet
Represented By: William Patrick Quigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaddeus Long
Represented By: Alec George Karakatsanis
Represented By: Anna Lise Lellelid-Douffet
Represented By: William Patrick Quigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Maxwell
Represented By: Alec George Karakatsanis
Represented By: Anna Lise Lellelid-Douffet
Represented By: William Patrick Quigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City
Represented By: Churita H. Hansell
Represented By: Cherrell R. Simms
Represented By: Adam J. Swensek
Represented By: Sharonda R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orleans Parish Criminal District Court
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Doubleday
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Represented By: Christopher Kent Tankersley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marlin N. Gusman
Represented By: Blake J. Arcuri
Represented By: Freeman Rudolph Matthews
Represented By: Inemesit U. O'Boyle
Represented By: Timothy R. Richardson
Represented By: Matthew Arthur Sherman
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur A Morrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Kazik
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Doubleday
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Represented By: Christopher Kent Tankersley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie A White
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Doubleday
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Represented By: Christopher Kent Tankersley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracey Flemings-Davillier
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Doubleday
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Represented By: Christopher Kent Tankersley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benedict Willard
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Doubleday
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Represented By: Christopher Kent Tankersley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Waldron
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Doubleday
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Represented By: Christopher Kent Tankersley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keva Landrum-Johnson
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Doubleday
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Represented By: Christopher Kent Tankersley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Pittman
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Doubleday
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Represented By: Christopher Kent Tankersley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron C. Williams
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Doubleday
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Represented By: Christopher Kent Tankersley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camille Buras
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Doubleday
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Represented By: Christopher Kent Tankersley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen K. Herman
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Doubleday
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Represented By: Christopher Kent Tankersley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darryl Derbigny
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Doubleday
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Represented By: Christopher Kent Tankersley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Hunter
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Doubleday
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Represented By: Christopher Kent Tankersley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franz Zibilich
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Doubleday
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Represented By: Christopher Kent Tankersley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry E Cantrell
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Doubleday
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Represented By: Christopher Kent Tankersley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?