Marks v. St. Tammany Parish Sheriffs Office, et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer R Marks
Defendant: Amore Neck, Bryan R Steinert, Samuel Hyneman, Travelers Indemnity Company, Jack Strain, Jr and St. Tammany Parish Sheriffs Office
Case Number: 2:2015cv05454
Filed: October 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: St Tammany
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that Joshua Palmintier and Chadwick Collings are sanctioned personally for their conduct in this case in the amount of $1,000 each. This amount must be paid by counsel personally, and may not be paid for by their respective law firms or clients. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the sanction is to be paid by Friday, May 26, 2017 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan.(bwn)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER AND REASONS granting 90 Motion in Limine to exclude evidence of the Plaintiff's past arrests and convictions; granting 91 Motion in Limine to exclude evidence of the Plaintiff;s involvement in a sting operation. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/19/2017. (clc)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER AND REASONS denying 92 Motion in Limine to exclude testimony or evidence related to the Plaintiff's employment. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/18/2017. (clc)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER AND REASONS denying 85 Motion in Limine to Exclude Depression References. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/17/2017. (clc)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion for Summary Judgment as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/10/2017. (cg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marks v. St. Tammany Parish Sheriffs Office, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amore Neck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan R Steinert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Hyneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Strain, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Tammany Parish Sheriffs Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer R Marks
Represented By: Joshua Michael Palmintier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?