Buisson Creative Strategies, L.L.C. et al v. Roberts et al
Plaintiff: Buisson Creative Strategies, L.L.C. and Gregory S. Buisson
Defendant: Christopher L Roberts and Jefferson Parish
Case Number: 2:2015cv06272
Filed: November 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER AND REASONS: Rec. Doc. 196 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Defendant, Christopher Roberts, is DENIED as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 2/27/2018. (sa)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER AND REASONS denying 203 Motion for New Trial or to Alter or Amend Judgment. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER AND REASONS granting 167 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and 169 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' Motions are GRANTED. Plaintiffs' claims are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 6/21/2017. (cg)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER AND REASONS granting Chris Roberts's 117 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDERED that 134 Motion to Quash is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the depositions of Deborah Cunningham Foshee and Ben Zahn are QUASHED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cml)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER AND REASONS denying 71 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buisson Creative Strategies, L.L.C. et al v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buisson Creative Strategies, L.L.C.
Represented By: Monique M. Lafontaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory S. Buisson
Represented By: Monique M. Lafontaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher L Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?