Bell v. Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, et al

Plaintiff: William C. Bell
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, CBS Corporation, York International Corporation, General Electric Company, IMO Industries, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Goulds Pump, Incorporated, Continental Motors, Inc., Crane Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Aurora Pump Company, Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc. and Cameron International Corporation
Case Number: 2:2015cv06394
Filed: December 1, 2015
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2017 445 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER AND REASONS re Choice of Law. IT IS ORDERED that, with respect to the alleged Idaho exposures, Louisiana law will apply to both the survivorship claim and the wrongful death claim. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk.(bwn)
March 6, 2017 436 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that the motions ( 396 , 397 , 398 , 399 , 400 , 401 , 404 , and 405 ) filed by General Electric Company, Crane Company, Buffalo, Aurora Pump Company, Atwood & Morill Co., Inc., CBS Corporation, IMO Industries , Inc., and Warren Pumps, LLC are DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motions ( 395 & 403 ) filed by York International Corporation and Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation are GRANTED and that all of plaintiffs' claims against York International Corporation and Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation in the above-captioned matter are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk. (bwn)
October 12, 2016 368 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS denying 249 MOTION to Strike John Croix from plaintiffs' witness list. FURTHER ORDERED that, should the defendants so request, defendants have permission to depose Mr. Croix before 10/31/2016, as stated herein. FURTHER O RDERED that, to the extent that defendants seek to supplement their expert reports to account for the testimony of Mr. Croix, any defendant may file a motion for leave with the Court to supplement their expert reports no later than 11/7/2016, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 10/12/2016.(blg)
October 11, 2016 361 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting 351 MOTION for Leave to File Reply; granting in part, denying in part 207 MOTION to Exclude Gasket and Packing Studies Conducted by or Relied Upon by Dr. James Millette and Any Exposure Testimony Based Thereon. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 10/11/2016.(blg)
October 7, 2016 360 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS re 221 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment - IT IS ORDERED that Warren Pumps motion for partial summary judgment is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants have permission to file one additional joint summary judgment motion of no more than fifteen pages addressing maritime law issues related to standing and damages. Defendants motion is due no later than October 14, 2016. Plaintiffs response, which is also limited to fifteen pages, is due no later than October 21, 2016. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk. (bwn)
October 6, 2016 358 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS granting in part, denying in part 204 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Stephen Terry Kraus, M.D., 211 MOTION to Strike and Daubert, MOTION to Exclude Causation Testimony from Plaintiff's Expert Dr. Richard Kradin, and 216 MOTION in Limine to Exclude the Testimony of Frank Parker. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 10/5/2016.(blg)
October 5, 2016 353 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS - 197 Motion in Limine to Preclude Introduction of or Reference to Regulatory Statements and Enactments to Prove Causation: DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 200 Motion in Limine to Preclude Plaintiff from Arguing that Crane Co. is Li able for Products Placed on or Within its Valves by Others Post-Sale: DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 202 Motion in Limine: DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE IN PART, DISMISSED AS MOOT IN PART, and DEFERRED IN PART; 218 Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence Regarding Collateral Sources: DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 219 Motion in Limine to Preclude Evidence of Settlements: DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk. (bwn)
October 4, 2016 352 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that Atwoods motion for summary judgment (R. Doc. No. 208 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Auroras motion for summary judgment (R. Doc. No. 210 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Buffalos motion for summary judgment (R. Doc. No. 206 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Cranes motion for summary judgment (R. Doc. No. 201 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that DeLavals mot ion for summary judgment (R. Doc. No. 229 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Foster Wheelers motion for summary judgment (R. Doc. No. 199 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that General Electrics motion fo r summary judgment (R. Doc. No. 198 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Warrens motion for summary judgment (R. Doc. No. 224 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Westinghouses motion for summary judgment (R. Doc. No. 203 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Yorks motion for summary judgment (R. Doc. No. 215 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants shall re-file their summary judgment briefs no lat er than October 18, 2016. Plaintiffs responses are due no later than November 4, 2016. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a status conference in this matter shall take place at 9:00 AM on Tuesday, October 11, 2016 in the chambers of the undersigned U.S. Di strict Judge. Counsel may participate by phone if the Court is provided with a telephone number prior to the conference.18 Plaintiffs should be prepared at conference to discuss which claims they intend to pursue given the legal standard set forth in this opinion. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk. (bwn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William C. Bell
Represented By: Jonathan Brett Clement
Represented By: Lauren Roussel Clement
Represented By: Benjamin Peter Dinehart
Represented By: Gerolyn Petit Roussel
Represented By: Perry Joseph Roussel, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Meredith K. Keenan
Represented By: Peter R. Tafaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Meredith K. Keenan
Represented By: Peter R. Tafaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: York International Corporation
Represented By: Rocky Wayne Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Meredith K. Keenan
Represented By: Peter R. Tafaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Henry Hart, IV
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Leigh Ann Tschirn Schell
Represented By: Lori Allen Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Henry Hart, IV
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Leigh Ann Tschirn Schell
Represented By: Lori Allen Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pump, Incorporated
Represented By: Lawrence G. Pugh, III
Represented By: Jacqueline Romero
Represented By: Shelley L. Thompson
Represented By: Donna M. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Motors, Inc.
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Douglas J. Moore
Represented By: Meera Unnithan Sossamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: Aleta W. Barnes
Represented By: Barry C. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Stacey Leigh Strain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Marc John Bitner
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: Arthur Wendel Stout, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atwood & Morrill Co., Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Marc John Bitner
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: Arthur Wendel Stout, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cameron International Corporation
Represented By: Marc John Bitner
Represented By: Joseph Lee McReynolds
Represented By: Howard Louis Murphy
Represented By: Arthur Wendel Stout, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?