Monumental Task Committee, Inc. et al v. Foxx et al
Plaintiff: Monumental Task Committee, Inc., Louisiana Landmarks Society, Foundation for Historical Louisiana, Inc. and Beauregard Camp No. 130, Inc.
Defendant: Anthony R. Foxx, Matthew Welbes, Federal Transit Administration, Department of Transportation United States, New Orleans Regional Transit Authority, Mitchell J. Landrieu and New Orleans City
Movant: Urban League of Greater New Orleans and Take 'Em Down NOLA
Case Number: 2:2015cv06905
Filed: December 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Presiding Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER & REASONS. It is ORDERED that all of Plaintiffs' remaining claims as to the General Robert E. Lee Monument, the P.G.T. Beauregard Monument, and the Jefferson Davis Monument are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Plainti ffs' Motion to Continue (R. Doc. 67 ) is DENIED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the City's Motion for Summary Judgment (R. Doc. 63 ) is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the RTA's Motion for Summary Judgment (R. Doc. 64 ) is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Federal Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and Summary Judgment (R. Doc. 62 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (Reference: 15-6905)(gec)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER & REASONS: ORDERED that the City of New Orleans and Mayor Mitchell J. Landrieus Motion for Summary Judgment (R. Doc. 138) is GRANTED and that Plaintiffs' claims as to the Liberty Place Monument are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the City's Motion to Dismiss (R. Doc. 120) is DISMISSED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 3/8/17. (Reference: all cases)(sek)
October 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER & REASONS. It is ORDERED that Defendants' 112 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 10/3/2016. (Reference: 16-12495)(gec)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER & REASONS: It is ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Injunction and/or Stay Pending Appeal (Rec. Doc. 57 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (gec)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER & REASONS: ORDERED that 11 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief is DENIED. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 1/26/16. (sek)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monumental Task Committee, Inc. et al v. Foxx et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monumental Task Committee, Inc.
Represented By: John B. Dunlap, III
Represented By: Susan Eccles
Represented By: Jennifer A. Fiore
Represented By: Franklin Hardy Jones, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louisiana Landmarks Society
Represented By: John B. Dunlap, III
Represented By: Susan Eccles
Represented By: Jennifer A. Fiore
Represented By: Franklin Hardy Jones, III
Represented By: James R. Logan, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foundation for Historical Louisiana, Inc.
Represented By: Franklin Hardy Jones, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beauregard Camp No. 130, Inc.
Represented By: Franklin Hardy Jones, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony R. Foxx
Represented By: Jason M. Bigelow(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Represented By: Peter M. Mansfield(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Represented By: K. Paige O'Hale(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Welbes
Represented By: Jason M. Bigelow(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Represented By: Peter M. Mansfield(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Represented By: K. Paige O'Hale(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Transit Administration
Represented By: Jason M. Bigelow(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Represented By: Peter M. Mansfield(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Represented By: K. Paige O'Hale(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Transportation United States
Represented By: Jason M. Bigelow(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Represented By: Peter M. Mansfield(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Represented By: K. Paige O'Hale(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans Regional Transit Authority
Represented By: N. Sundiata Haley
Represented By: Randy George McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell J. Landrieu
Represented By: Rebecca H. Dietz
Represented By: Ewell Patrick Eagan
Represented By: Gregory J. Feeney
Represented By: Churita H. Hansell
Represented By: Adam J. Swensek
Represented By: Cherrell Simms Taplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City
Represented By: Rebecca H. Dietz
Represented By: Ewell Patrick Eagan
Represented By: Gregory J. Feeney
Represented By: Churita H. Hansell
Represented By: Adam J. Swensek
Represented By: Cherrell Simms Taplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Urban League of Greater New Orleans
Represented By: Harvey Sylvanous Bartlett, III
Represented By: Emma E. Daschbach
Represented By: Joshua Simon Force
Represented By: Timothy B. Francis
Represented By: David Adam Freedman
Represented By: James M. Garner
Represented By: Gladstone N. Jones, III
Represented By: Maurice Carlos Ruffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Take 'Em Down NOLA
Represented By: Sara H. Godchaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?