Funez et al v. E.M.S.P., LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Sulma Hernandez, Dianna Mejia, Dilcia Nunez, Karlina Molina, Lydia Vega, Reyna Rodriguez, Jessica Marilu Rosalez Funez, Candy Melissa Zamora, Julia S. Carballo, Marlene Rodriguez and Wendy Ramirez |
Defendant: |
E.M.S.P., LLC, Edwin A. Miranda and Sadia Esther Palacio |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv01922 |
Filed: |
March 6, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana |
Office: |
New Orleans Office |
County: |
Jefferson |
Presiding Judge: |
Jane Triche Milazzo |
Presiding Judge: |
Karen Wells Roby |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
29 U.S.C. ยง 201 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 14, 2019 |
Filing
139
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, Rec. Doc. 130 . The Court hereby approves the R&R of the Chief United States Magistrate Judge and adopts it as this Court's opinion in this matter except to the extent as modified by this Order. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees (Rec. Doc. 108 ) is GRANTED and that Plaintiffs are awarded reasonable attorneys' fees in the amount of $99,318.70. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiffs are awarded reasona ble costs in the amount of $3,537.49. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall satisfy their obligation to the Plaintiffs no later than twenty-one (21) days after the signing of this Order. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 2/14/2019.(sa)
|
October 16, 2018 |
Filing
130
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: IT IS RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's 108 MOTION for Attorney Fees be GRANTED and that the Plaintiffs be awarded reasonable attorney's fees in the amount of $94,684.50. FURTHER RECOMMENDED that the Plainti ffs be awarded reasonable cost in the amount of $3,537.49. FURTHER RECOMMENDED that Defendants and their counsel shall satisfy their obligation to the Plaintiff no later than twenty-one (21) days after the signing of this order. Objections to R&R due by 10/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on October 15, 2018.(mp)
|
September 30, 2016 |
Filing
34
ORDER: ORDERED that 21 Motion to Compel Discovery is GRANTED IN PART. FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiffs request to compel production of certain pages of Defendants franchise agreement is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiffs request t o compel production of the Defendants franchise agreement in globo is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Parties are to provide the Court with a draft protective order signed by all parties no later than October 4, 2016. After the Protective Order is signed by the Court, the Court will release the responsive pages to the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cml)
|
September 23, 2016 |
Filing
32
ORDER : ORDERED that 21 First MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses is GRANTED IN PART, DENIED IN PART, AND TAKEN UNDER SUBMISSION IN PART.FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiffs request to strike Defendants boilerplate objections is GRANTED . FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiffs request for Defendant to provide more definite discovery responses is GRANTED as stated within document. FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiffs request to compel the Defendants response to its interrogatories is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendant produce to the Court any responsive documents to Request for Production Nos. 21 and 22 no later than Wednesday, September 28, 2016 for in camera review. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby.(cml)
|
August 24, 2016 |
Filing
20
ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and deferring in part 11 Motion to Certify Class. Within twenty days of the entry of this Order and prior to distributing notice to potential opt-in plaintiffs, the parties shall submit a joint proposed notice to the Court along with an appropriate motion for the adoption of such notice. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Funez et al v. E.M.S.P., LLC et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Sulma Hernandez |
Represented By: |
Michael Thomas Tusa, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Christopher L. Williams |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Dianna Mejia |
Represented By: |
Michael Thomas Tusa, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Christopher L. Williams |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Dilcia Nunez |
Represented By: |
Michael Thomas Tusa, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Christopher L. Williams |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Karlina Molina |
Represented By: |
Michael Thomas Tusa, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Christopher L. Williams |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Lydia Vega |
Represented By: |
Michael Thomas Tusa, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Christopher L. Williams |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Reyna Rodriguez |
Represented By: |
Michael Thomas Tusa, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Christopher L. Williams |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Jessica Marilu Rosalez Funez |
Represented By: |
Michael Thomas Tusa, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Christopher L. Williams |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Candy Melissa Zamora |
Represented By: |
Michael Thomas Tusa, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Christopher L. Williams |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Julia S. Carballo |
Represented By: |
Michael Thomas Tusa, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Christopher L. Williams |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Marlene Rodriguez |
Represented By: |
Michael Thomas Tusa, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Christopher L. Williams |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Wendy Ramirez |
Represented By: |
Christopher L. Williams |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: E.M.S.P., LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Edwin A. Miranda |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Sadia Esther Palacio |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?