Castellanos v. Saints & Santos Construction, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jose Castellanos
Defendant: Saints & Santos Construction, LLC, Wiliomar Oliveira and Jose Santamaria
Case Number: 2:2016cv02501
Filed: March 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Ivan L.R. Lemelle
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:0207
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that the 186 motion for attorneys' fees is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 03/25/2019. (am)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 184 OPINION: IT IS ORDERED that Defendants shall pay liquidated damages in the amount of seven thousand and four hundred and thirty-nine dollars and thirty two cents ($7,439.32), as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 6/13/2018.(jls)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER AND REASONS granting 60 Motion to Certify Class as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 5/4/2017. (cms)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that Rufino's 100 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and the remaining Defendants' 106 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 5/4/2017. (mmv)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER AND REASONS DENYING 32 Motion for Summary Judgment without prejudice to reurge as set forth in document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff will be allowed additional discovery, limited to determining whether there is a material factual dispute relative to Plaintiff's contention that Defendant movant is Plaintiff's employer or joint-employer.Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 10/26/2016. (mmv)
June 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER AND REASONS granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, dismissing without prejudice claims against Defendant Santamaria for insufficient service. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 6/20/2016. (ijg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castellanos v. Saints & Santos Construction, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Castellanos
Represented By: William Henry Beaumont
Represented By: Roberto L. Costales
Represented By: Emily Westermeier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saints & Santos Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiliomar Oliveira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Santamaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?