Fairley v. Art Catering Inc et al
Plaintiff: Mary Fairley
Defendant: ART Catering Inc and Vantage Deepwater Drilling, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv03488
Filed: April 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Webster
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Presiding Judge: Sarah S. Vance
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 46:30104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER: ORDERED that the 164 Motion to Fix Attorney Fees is GRANTED and that the Plaintiff is awarded reasonable attorney's fees in the amount of $880.00. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant, ART Catering, Inc. and its counsel shall satisfy their obligation to the Plaintiff no later than twenty-one (21) days after the signing of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (Reference: all cases)(mp)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER denying 101 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (Reference: as listed)(jrc)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that 47 Motion for Protective Order Quashing Deposition is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that ART Catering, Inc. may not take a discovery deposition of Denise Battle prior to the Plaintiffs notice deposition. FURTHER ORDERED that 54 Motion to Compel is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiffs motion is GRANTED to the extent that the recorded statements should be furnished to the Plaintiff immediately following the deposition of the individuals who provided the statements. FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiffs motion is DENIED AS MOOT to the extent that the motion seeks to compel the Defendants insurance policy.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (cml)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that 24 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as explained in document. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 7/25/2017. (ajn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fairley v. Art Catering Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Fairley
Represented By: Frank E. Lamothe, III
Represented By: Richard Massie Martin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ART Catering Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vantage Deepwater Drilling, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?