RSDC Holdings, LLC v. M.G. Mayer Yacht Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: RSDC Holdings, LLC
Defendant: M.G. Mayer Yacht Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv03573
Filed: April 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: East Baton Rouge
Presiding Judge: Ivan L.R. Lemelle
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:31343 Commercial Instruments & Maritime Liens
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER AND REASONS - Pursuant to the judgment entered in this matter on February 1, 2019; IT IS ORDERED that Mayer Yacht is awarded attorney's fees, costs and expenses in the total amount of $68,794.13. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mayer Yach t is awarded interest in the total amount of $29,021.25. Together with the amount of the principal previously awarded by judgment ($29,394.15), the amount hereby awarded for attorney's fees, costs, and expenses ($68,794.13) and interest ($29,021.25), combine for a total amount owed by Calloway to Mayer Yacht from the date of judgment (February 1, 2019) of $127,209.53, plus post-judgment interest. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 5/14/2019.(sa)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that M.G. Mayer Yacht Services, Inc.'s 83 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that RSDC Holdings LLC and Donald Joe Calloway's 78 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to M.G. Mayer Yacht Services, Inc.'s claim for quantum meruit and DENIED as to M.G. Mayer Yacht Services, Inc.'s claims for breach of contract and detrimental reliance. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 11/26/18. (clc)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that RSDC's 20 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings is DENIED. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 5/24/2017.(ajn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RSDC Holdings, LLC v. M.G. Mayer Yacht Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RSDC Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas M. Graphia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.G. Mayer Yacht Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?