State Bank & Trust Company v. Lil Al M/V et al
Plaintiff: State Bank & Trust Company
Defendant: C & G Liftboats, L.L.C., AMC Liftboats, Inc., Polly D. Cheramie, Adam A. Cheramie, Lil Al M/V, Mr. Alan M/V and Whitney M/V L/B
Movant: Industrial Diesel Service LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv05053
Filed: May 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Lafourche
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:31325
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER AND REASONS - Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 94 ) is GRANTED; Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 81 ) is DENIED; Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on its In Personam Claims (Rec . Doc. 102 ) is GRANTED; and Plaintiff's Motion for Interlocutory Sale of the Vessels (Rec. Doc. 88 ) is GRANTED, as set forth in document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff and Intervenor Industrial Diesel Services, LLC shall jointly file a memorandum within 10 days of this Order identifying any issues remaining in this matter. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 12/4/2018. (sa)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER AND REASONS granting 112 Motion to Stay. IT IS ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED, and this matter is STAYED and ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED to be reopened after a decision is issued by the Fifth Circuit on Defendants' interlocutory appeal. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 6/12/2018. (sa)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER AND REASONS granting in part Plaintiff's 60 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying Defendants' 66 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Plaintiff is entitled to judgment recognizing its preferred ship mortgage on the M /V Lil Al, Official Number 1250213, as valid. Plaintiff's request for a judgment recognizing a valid preferred ship mortgage on the M/V Mr. Alan, Official Number 1040047 and the M/V L/B Whitney, Official Number D644243, is DENIED. All other requests for relief by Plaintiff are DEFERRED. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER AND REASONS granting Intervenor Industrial Diesel Service, LLC'S 71 Motion for Summary Judgment. Intervenor is entitled to judgment against the vessels in these principal amounts, together with pre- and post-judgment interest and costs. A ruling regarding the ranking of said liens is deferred. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (ecm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Bank & Trust Company v. Lil Al M/V et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Bank & Trust Company
Represented By: George Joseph Ledet, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & G Liftboats, L.L.C.
Represented By: Christopher Todd Caplinger
Represented By: Stewart Foster Peck
Represented By: David Boies Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMC Liftboats, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Todd Caplinger
Represented By: Stewart Foster Peck
Represented By: David Boies Sharpe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polly D. Cheramie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam A. Cheramie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lil Al M/V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Alan M/V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney M/V L/B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Industrial Diesel Service LLC
Represented By: Daniel Levy
Represented By: Robert Seth Reich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?