Leone v. General Motors LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Tanya Leone
Defendant: General Motors LLC and Avis Budget Car Rental, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2016cv06830
Filed: May 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Ivan L.R. Lemelle
Presiding Judge: Daniel E. Knowles
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER AND REASONS GRANTING 67 Motion Pursuant to FRCP Rule 60(a) and/or Alternatively Rule 59(e) to Correct and/or Alter or Amend the Final Judgment Issued on September 5, 2017. A motion for reconsideration of this Order, based on the appropriate Federal Rule of Civil Procedure, if any, must be filed within ten (10) days of this Order, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 10/18/2017. (jls)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that the 60 , 62 , 63 , and 64 motions are GRANTED AS UNOPPOSED, it appearing to the Court that the motions have merit. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all of Plaintiffs claims in the above-captioned matter are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 8/23/2017.(jls)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 OPINION: IT IS ORDERED that the 28 motion is DENIED. The jury trial remains scheduled for October 16, 2017. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 7/21/2017. (mmv)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leone v. General Motors LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Leone
Represented By: Toni R Arnona
Represented By: Vincent R. Arnona
Represented By: Donald Lee Rose, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Michael R. Denton
Represented By: Carl Joseph Giffin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avis Budget Car Rental, L.L.C.
Represented By: George P. Hebbler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?