CMP, LLC v. Railway Spine Productions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: CMP, LLC
Defendant: Railway Spine Productions, LLC, Seven Curses Productions, LLC, Abel Meet Cain Productions, LLC and Home Box Office, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv06850
Filed: May 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Martin L.C. Feldman
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that the defendants' 72 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part insofar as the defendants are entitled to judgment as a matter of law dismissing the plaintiff's claims for breach of contract for failure t o secure permits, breach of contract for attempt to impose unauthorized condition, and trespass and DENIED in part insofar as the plaintiff's claim for breach of site representative fee provision and its claim for contractual attorney's fees remain for trial. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 4/5/2017. (clc)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff's 24 partial motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The defendants' 40 cross-motion for partial summary judgment is GRANTED in part (as to the plaintiff's entitlement to the Overage Fees) and DENIED in part (as to the plaintiff's entitlement to Site Representative Fees and legal fees). Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 2/8/2017. (mmv)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER AND REASONS granting 7 defendants' partial motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim. The plaintiff's defamation claim is dismissed. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/5/16. (clc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CMP, LLC v. Railway Spine Productions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CMP, LLC
Represented By: Charlton Beattie Ogden, III
Represented By: Perry Roger Staub, Jr.
Represented By: Dorothy L. Tarver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Railway Spine Productions, LLC
Represented By: Laurence D. LeSueur, Jr.
Represented By: Andrea Mahady Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seven Curses Productions, LLC
Represented By: Laurence D. LeSueur, Jr.
Represented By: Andrea Mahady Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abel Meet Cain Productions, LLC
Represented By: Laurence D. LeSueur, Jr.
Represented By: Andrea Mahady Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Box Office, Inc.
Represented By: Laurence D. LeSueur, Jr.
Represented By: Andrea Mahady Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?