Essex Crane Rental Corp v. DB CROSSMAR 14, et al
Plaintiff: Essex Crane Rental Corp
Defendant: DB Crossmar 14, Manitowoc 4100W-I 230 Ton Lift Crane and Cross Group Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv08146
Filed: June 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Ivan L.R. Lemelle
Presiding Judge: Sally Shushan
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that the 77 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED as set forth in document.Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 3/13/2017. (mmv)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that the 82 motion for an extension is DENIED as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 3/13/2017. (mmv)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER AND REASONS GRANTING 69 Motion to Confirm United States Marshal's Sale and to Cancel All Mortgages, Liens, Encumbrances, and Pre-Existing Claims against the D/B CROSSMAR 14 as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 11/9/2016. (mmv) (3CC: USM)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER AND REASONS granting 26 Motion for Order Noting Default; granting 27 Motion to Set Sale of Seized Vessel; dismissing as moot 46 Motion to Continue Sale; granting 49 Motion to Continue Requested Sale Date of Seized Vessel From October 17, 2016 to October 24, 2016. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 10/6/2016. (3ccUSM, NEF: Financial) (lag)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Essex Crane Rental Corp v. DB CROSSMAR 14, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Essex Crane Rental Corp
Represented By: William C. Baldwin
Represented By: John J. Broders
Represented By: Catherine C. Darden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DB Crossmar 14
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manitowoc 4100W-I 230 Ton Lift Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cross Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?