Cross v. Bates-Anderson et al
Plaintiff: Daphne Cross
Defendant: Candice Bates-Anderson, Lemoyne Reine, Daphne Johnson, Tenee Felix and Cody Smith
Case Number: 2:2016cv11626
Filed: June 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Presiding Judge: Jay C. Zainey
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER AND REASONS GRANTING 23 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. All federal claims against these defendants in their personal capacities are dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 24 Cross Motion is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 6/28/2017. (ajn) Modified on 6/28/2017 (ajn).
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Party Tenee Felix (In her official capacity of Xavier attorney of Louisiana Center for Children's Rights) dismissed. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (jrc)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER AND REASONS: Granting 13 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Party Candice Bates-Anderson (In her official capacity as Chief Judge for Juvenile Court) is dismissed. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 10/24/2016. (ajn)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER and REASONS Granting 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 9/14/2016. (ajn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cross v. Bates-Anderson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candice Bates-Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lemoyne Reine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daphne Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenee Felix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cody Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daphne Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?