D'Aquin v. Starwood et al
Plaintiff: Thomas L D'Aquin
Defendant: Starwood, Westin Hotel and Senate Hospitality Group, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv12798
Filed: July 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 00:0000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant 28 Starwood's Second Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/16/2017. (mmv)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Starwood's 16 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 is GRANTED IN PART to the extent that it requests dismissal of Plaintiff's claim for alienation of affection and DENIED IN PART to t he extent that it requests dismissal of Plaintiff's action against Starwood in its entirety. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted fourteen days to file a more definite statement. Specifically, Plaintiff is granted leave to: (1) advise the Court of the date that the injury occurred; (2) identify any actions, if any, which could have prevented Plaintiff from discovering the injury; and (3) advise the Court if Plaintiff is making any claim not in tort or delictual in nature. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/8/2017. (mmv)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING 11 Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Senate Hospitality Group, LLC and Westin Hotels in the above captioned matter are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/31/2016. (mmv)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'Aquin v. Starwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas L D'Aquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westin Hotel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senate Hospitality Group, LLC
Represented By: Daniel B. Centner
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?