GLF Construction Corporation v. FEDCON Joint Venture et al
Plaintiff: GLF Construction Corporation
Defendant: FEDCON Joint Venture, David Boland, Inc., JT Construction Enterprise Corporation and Western Surety Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv13022
Filed: July 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Sarah S Vance
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40 U.S.C. ยง 3131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 3, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2017 Filing 39 Receipt of Case Transfer by Middle District of Florida (lag)
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER AND REASONS granting #37 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION to Transfer Case by GLF Construction Corporation. Case transferred to District of Middle District of Florida, Tampa Division. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/2/2017.(cg)
October 16, 2017 Filing 37 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION to Transfer Case by GLF Construction Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guy, Matthew)
September 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER AND REASONS denying #35 Motion to lift the stay in part and transfer. This matter remains administratively closed pending the stay. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 9/8/2017. (cg)
August 30, 2017 Filing 35 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION To Partially Lift Stay, For Partial Transfer and Stipulation, by GLF Construction Corporation, and by David Boland, Inc., FEDCON Joint Venture, JT Construction Enterprise Corporation, Western Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leith, Arthur)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER AND REASONS denying #26 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/20/2017. (cg)
April 26, 2017 Filing 33 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by GLF Construction Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Grandi Lavori Fincosit, S.p.A. for GLF Construction Corporation (Guy, Matthew)
April 25, 2017 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by GLF Construction Corporation re #26 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #25 Order on Motion to Stay ; . (cg)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/25/2017. (cg)
April 25, 2017 Filing 30 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Further Support of Its Motion for Clarification and/or Reconsideration in Regard to the Court's Order and Reasons Dated March 7, 2017 by GLF Construction Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Reply in Further Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Guy, Matthew)
April 12, 2017 Filing 29 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by All Defendants re #26 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #25 Order on Motion to Stay ; . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Leith, Arthur)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Setting/Resetting Hearing on #26 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #25 Order on Motion to Stay. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the submission date for plaintiffs' motion is hereby continued to April 26, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that memorandum in opposition, if any, shall be filed no later than April 12, 2017. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/5/2017.(cg)
April 4, 2017 Filing 27 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date for Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification and/or Reconsideration in Regard to the Court's Order and Reasons Dated March 7, 2017 by David Boland, Inc., FEDCON Joint Venture, JT Construction Enterprise Corporation, Western Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leith, Arthur)
March 24, 2017 Filing 26 First MOTION for Reconsideration re #25 Order on Motion to Stay ; by GLF Construction Corporation. Motion(s) will be submitted on 4/12/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Notice of Submission)(Guy, Matthew)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER & REASONS granting #8 Motion to Stay. This matter is administratively closed pending the stay. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 3/7/2017. (mmm)
February 13, 2017 Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by GLF Construction Corporation re #8 MOTION to Stay , Or, In The Alternative, For Extension of Time. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mmm)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/13/2017. (mmm)
January 31, 2017 Filing 22 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Brief and to Exceed Page Limits by GLF Construction Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proposed Pleading Surreply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stay, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Lorenzo Ellis, #5 Exhibit 1 to Surreply in Opposition, #6 Exhibit 2 to Surreply in Opposition)(Frilot, Mark)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 MOTION for Extension of Submission Date. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/1/2017 as to #8 MOTION to Stay , Or, In The Alternative, For Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/9/2017.(mmm)
January 5, 2017 Filing 20 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #19 Reply to Response to Motion, and Extension of Submission Date by GLF Construction Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Frilot, Mark)
January 5, 2017 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by David Boland, Inc., FEDCON Joint Venture, JT Construction Enterprise Corporation, Western Surety Company re #8 MOTION to Stay , Or, In The Alternative, For Extension of Time. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mmm)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/5/2017. (mmm)
January 4, 2017 Filing 17 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #16 MOTION for Leave to File. Filing attorney should have selected 'Y' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to remove submission information and add 'Exparte'. (mmm)
January 3, 2017 Filing 16 EXPARTE MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Stay, Or, in the Alternative, for Extension of Time by David Boland, Inc., FEDCON Joint Venture, JT Construction Enterprise Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit No. 1, #4 Exhibit A to 1, #5 Exhibit B to 1, #6 Exhibit C to 1, #7 Exhibit D to 1)(Leith, Arthur) Modified text/submission on 1/4/2017 (mmm).
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 MOTION to Continue Submission Date as to #8 MOTION to Stay , Or, In The Alternative, For Extension of Time. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/4/2017. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 12/5/2016.(mmm)
December 5, 2016 Filing 14 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #13 MOTION to Continue. This motion will be decided by the district judge. Clerk took corrective action. (mmm)
December 2, 2016 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date for Defendants' Motion to Stay, Or in the Alternative For Extension of Time by David Boland, Inc., FEDCON Joint Venture, JT Construction Enterprise Corporation, Western Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Leith, Arthur) Modified test/referral on 12/5/2016 (mmm).
November 29, 2016 Filing 12 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by GLF Construction Corporation re #8 MOTION to Stay , Or, In The Alternative, For Extension of Time . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Affidavit)(Frilot, Mark)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Joint MOTION to Continue and Reset Submission Date as to #8 MOTION to Stay , Or, In The Alternative, For Extension of Time: Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/7/2016. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/24/2016.(mmm)
October 21, 2016 Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #9 Joint MOTION to Continue and Reset Submission Date.. This motion will be decided by the district judge. Clerk took corrective action. (mmm)
October 21, 2016 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Continue and Reset Submission Date by GLF Construction Corporation and Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frilot, Mark) Modified text/filers/submission on 10/21/2016 (mmm).
October 19, 2016 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay , Or, In The Alternative, For Extension of Time by David Boland, Inc., FEDCON Joint Venture, JT Construction Enterprise Corporation, Western Surety Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/9/2016. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Notice of Submission)Attorney Sarah Elizabeth McMillan added to party David Boland, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Elizabeth McMillan added to party FEDCON Joint Venture(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Elizabeth McMillan added to party JT Construction Enterprise Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Sarah Elizabeth McMillan added to party Western Surety Company(pty:dft).(McMillan, Sarah)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jordan Scott Nadel. (Attachment(s) #1 Exhibit) Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/11/2016. (mmm)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ira Loren Libanoff. (Attachment(s) #1 Exhibit) Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 10/11/2016. (mmm)
October 7, 2016 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Jordan S. Nadel) (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-5742924) by GLF Construction Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Jordan Nadel, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Attorney Registration Form)(Frilot, Mark)
October 7, 2016 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Ira L. Libanoff) (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-5742890) by GLF Construction Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit of Ira Libanoff, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Attorney Registration Form)(Frilot, Mark)
August 22, 2016 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Western Surety Company on 8/4/2016, answer due 10/3/2016. (Frilot, Mark)
July 21, 2016 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (jeg)
July 20, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FEDCON Joint Venture, JT Construction Enterprise Corporation, Western Surety Company, David Boland Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-5579330) filed by GLF Construction Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 01, #2 Exhibit 02, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Mark Wayne Frilot added to party GLF Construction Corporation(pty:pla).(Frilot, Mark) Modified on 7/22/2016: Waiver of Service per Intake (mmm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GLF Construction Corporation v. FEDCON Joint Venture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLF Construction Corporation
Represented By: Matthew J. Guy
Represented By: Ira Loren Libanoff
Represented By: Mark Wayne Frilot
Represented By: Jordan Scott Nadel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDCON Joint Venture
Represented By: Eric J. Simonson
Represented By: Arthur H. Leith
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Boland, Inc.
Represented By: Eric J. Simonson
Represented By: Arthur H. Leith
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JT Construction Enterprise Corporation
Represented By: Eric J. Simonson
Represented By: Arthur H. Leith
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Represented By: Eric J. Simonson
Represented By: Arthur H. Leith
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?