Legeaux et al v. Borg-Warner Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Nolan Legeaux and Susan Legeaux
Defendant: Borg-Warner Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Caterpillar Inc, CBS Corporation, CertainTeed Corporation Inc., Cleaver-Brooks Sales & Services, Inc., Crane Company, Eagle, Inc., DAP Products Inc., Flowserve US Inc, Gardner Denver, Inc., General Electric Company, Georgia-Pacific LLC, Genuine Parts Company, Goulds Pumps, Incorporated, IMO Industries, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., Riley Power, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Warren Pumps, LLC, Zurn Industries, LLC, Huntington Ingalls, Inc., Western Oceanic Services, Inc., Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc., Vigor Industrial LLC and Vigor Shipyards, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv13773
Filed: August 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action be and is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within sixty days, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. The Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the compromise agreed upon by the parties. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties be directed to file an appropriate order of dismissal as soon as the settlement documents are executed. If no motion to reopen is filed, the case is officially closed and the Clerk of Court shall be relieved of responsibility of sending out further notices in this matter. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/27/2017.(jls)
June 22, 2017 Filing 146 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #145 Notice. **Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section G, Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.** (jls)
June 22, 2017 Filing 145 NOTICE of Settlement by All Remaining Defendants by Nolan Legeaux and Susan Legeaux . (Dunn, Alex) Modified text on 6/22/2017 (jls).
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Motion for Voluntary Dismissal, With Prejudice, filed by plaintiffs, Nolan Legeaux and Susan Legeaux, is GRANTED, and that all of plaintiffs' claims in the captioned matter asserted against Huntington Ingalls Incorporated are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own costs, and reserving any and all rights against any other person, entity, or corporation, whether named or unnamed in this action. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 5/12/2017. (mmv)
May 10, 2017 Filing 143 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #142 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Huntington Ingalls . **Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action.** (jls)
May 9, 2017 Filing 142 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice Huntington Ingalls by Nolan Legeaux, Susan Legeaux. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Dismissing with Prejudice Huntington Ingalls)(Dunn, Alex) Modified text on 5/10/2017 (jls).
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER GRANTING #136 Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice. All claims of plaintiffs, Nolan Legeaux and Susan Legeaux, as against General Electric, ONLY,be and the same are hereby dismissed, without prejudice, each party to bear its own respective costs and specifically reserving to the plaintiffs all rights to prosecute claims and/or actions against all other defendants, solidary obligors, and other persons and/or entities named or not named herein. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/16/2017. (mmv)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER GRANTING #135 Motion for Dismissal Without Prejudice. All claims of plaintiffs, Nolan Legeaux and Susan Legeaux, as against Westinghouse, ONLY, by and the same are hereby dismissed, without prejudice, each party to bear its own respective costs and specifically reserving to the plaintiffs all rights to prosecute claims and/or actions against all other defendants, solidary obligors, and other persons and/or entities named or not named herein. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/16/2017. (mmv)
March 15, 2017 Filing 139 REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2017 3:00 PM before Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Jury Trial set for 7/24/2017 9:00 AM before Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Issued by Clerk for Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form, #2 Standing Order)(jrc)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown. Judge Susie Morgan no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 3/15/2017.(cg)
March 15, 2017 Filing 137 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #135 MOTION to Dismiss Party , #136 MOTION to Dismiss Party ; Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section "E" Judge Susie Morgan. (cg)
March 15, 2017 Filing 136 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, James)
March 15, 2017 Filing 135 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, James)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER RE-ALLOTTING CASE. Case re-allotted to Judge Susie Morgan. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. (NEF: C. Nelson, Judge Morgan)(ecm)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Lance M Africk recused. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk.(bwn)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting #130 Motion to Dismiss Cross Claims and #131 Motion to Dismiss Cross Claims. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk. (bwn)
March 10, 2017 Filing 131 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Cross Claims by General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, James)
March 10, 2017 Filing 130 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Cross Claims by CBS Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, James)
March 9, 2017 Filing 129 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lance M Africk: Status Conference held on 3/9/2017. IT IS ORDERED that BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC shall file its unopposed motion to dismiss Johns-Manville by March 20, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by March 22, 2017 the plaintiffs shall file a motion to substitute the appropriate party in place of plaintiff Nolan Legeaux in light of Mr. Legeaux's unfortunate death. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendants shall reply in good faith to all outstanding settlement demands by March 22, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, the Court having received notice of their settlement with the plaintiffs, all of plaintiffs' claims against Georgia-Pacific LLC and Goulds Pumps, Incorporated in the above-captioned matter are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the right, upon good cause shown, to reopen the action or to seek summary judgment enforcing the compromise if settlement is not consummated within a reasonable time. The Court retains jurisdiction for all purposes, including enforcing the settlement agreement entered into by the parties. (bwn)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that all of Huntington's claims in the above-captioned matter against Shell Oil Company, Tennessee Gas Pipeline Company, LLC, EPEC Oil Company, El Paso Energy E.S.T. Company, George Kellet & Sons Inc., and Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 3/8/2017.(bwn)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that all of Huntington's cross claims in the above-captioned matter against Gardner Denver, Inc. are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 3/8/2017.(bwn)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER granting #125 Motion to Dismiss Cross-Claims. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk. (bwn)
February 23, 2017 Filing 125 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Huntington Ingalls, Inc.'s Cross Claims by Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc., Vigor Industrial LLC, Vigor Shipyards, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dore, Philip)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that all claims against Huntington Ingalls, Inc. in the above-captioned matter are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the right, upon good cause shown, to reopen the action or to seek summary judgment enforcing the compromise if settlement is not consummated within a reasonable time. The Court retains jurisdiction for all purposes, including enforcing the settlement agreement entered into by the parties. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk.(bwn)
February 16, 2017 Filing 123 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #122 Notice of Settlement - Notices of Settlement should either be emailed or faxed directly to chambers. In the future, please do so. No further action necessary. (bwn)
February 16, 2017 Filing 122 NOTICE of Settlement by Georgia-Pacific LLC. (Rossi, Alexandra)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER granting #120 Motion to Dismiss; all of plaintiffs' claims against the Vigor Parties are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/15/2017. (blg)
February 14, 2017 Filing 120 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc., Vigor Industrial, LLC, and Vigor Shipyards, Inc. by Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc., Vigor Industrial LLC, Vigor Shipyards, Inc., Nolan Legeaux and Susan Legeaux (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dore, Philip) Modified on 2/15/2017 to edit filers (bwn). Modified on 2/15/2017 (blg).
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER AND REASONS granting #92 MOTION for Partial Dismissal; all of plaintiffs' claims against BorgWarner for pre-death loss of consortium, market share liability, enterprise liability, concert of action, punitive damages, and attorneys' fees are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/8/2017.(blg)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting #115 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #105 Crossclaim, as to Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc., Vigor Industrial LLC and Vigor Shipyards, Inc. answer due 3/2/2017. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/8/2017. (blg)
February 8, 2017 Filing 117 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Johns-Manville filed by BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C)(ajn)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting #107 Motion for Leave to File Third Party Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 2/8/2017. (ajn)
February 8, 2017 Filing 115 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #105 Crossclaim by Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc., Vigor Industrial LLC, Vigor Shipyards, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dore, Philip) Modified on 2/8/2017 to edit docket text (bwn).
February 1, 2017 Filing 114 ANSWER to #105 Huntington Ingalls Incorporated's Cross-Claim, by CertainTeed Corporation Inc.(Franco, Jason) Modified text on 2/2/2017 (tm).
January 27, 2017 Filing 113 ANSWER to #105 Crossclaim, by Borg-Warner Morse TEC LLC.(Hays, Bradley) Modified text on 1/30/2017 (jls).
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting #101 Motion to Continue Status Conference. Status Conference rescheduled for 3/9/2017 at 9:00 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that parties who have already submitted their status reports need not submit additional reports prior to the conference unless matters have materially changed with respect to that party. Parties who have yet to submit their status reports must do so five working days prior to the status conference. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk. (bwn)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING #106 MOTION to Dismiss Gardner Denver, Inc. Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk.(bwn)
January 20, 2017 Filing 110 Summons Issued as to EPEC Oil Company, El Paso Energy E.S.T. Company, George Kellet & Sons Inc, Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Shell Oil Company, Tennessee Gas Pipeline Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(bwn)
January 20, 2017 Filing 109 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #106 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice - Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent motions are not set for submission. Clerk has removed submission date. (bwn)
January 19, 2017 Filing 108 STATUS REPORT by Borg-Warner Corporation, BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC (Senter, Meghan)
January 19, 2017 Filing 107 MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Complaint by Borg-Warner Corporation, BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/8/2017. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Notice of Submission, #6 Proposed Order)(Hays, Bradley) Modified on 1/20/2017 to edit docket text (bwn).
January 19, 2017 Filing 106 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Gardner Denver, Inc., Nolan Legeaux and Susan Legeaux. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Matherne, James) Modified on 1/20/2017 to remove submission date and edit filers (bwn).
January 19, 2017 Filing 105 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Shell Oil Company, Tennessee Gas Pipeline Company, LLC, EPEC Oil Company, El Paso Energy E.S.T. Company, George Kellet & Sons, Inc., and Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, CROSSCLAIM with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Huntington Ingalls, Inc..(Shockey, Patrick) Modified on 1/20/2017 to edit docket text (bwn).
January 18, 2017 Filing 104 STATUS REPORT by General Electric Company (Brown, James)
January 18, 2017 Filing 103 STATUS REPORT by CBS Corporation (Brown, James)
January 18, 2017 Filing 102 STATUS REPORT by Georgia-Pacific LLC (Benoit, Allison)
January 18, 2017 Filing 101 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Status Conference by Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc., Vigor Industrial LLC, Vigor Shipyards, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Seiler, Scott)
January 18, 2017 Filing 100 STATUS REPORT by Genuine Parts Company (Puente-Martin, Magali)
January 18, 2017 Filing 99 STATUS REPORT by CertainTeed Corporation Inc. (Franco, Jason)
January 18, 2017 Filing 98 STATUS REPORT by Union Carbide Corporation (Richeson, McGready)
January 17, 2017 Filing 97 STATUS REPORT by Huntington Ingalls, Inc. (Ellinghausen, Edwin)
January 17, 2017 Filing 96 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #95 Pretrial Memorandum; Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is 'Status Report'. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. Document contains incorrect Section. All future pleadings must reflect Section "I". Name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. No further action is necessary. (blg)
January 17, 2017 Filing 95 STATUS REPORT by All Plaintiffs. (Dunn, Alex) Modified on 1/17/2017 (blg).
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER: Status Conference RESET for 1/25/2017 10:00 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/13/2017.(blg)
January 13, 2017 Filing 93 STATUS REPORT by Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc., Vigor Industrial LLC, Vigor Shipyards, Inc. (Dore, Philip)
January 13, 2017 Filing 92 MOTION for Partial Dismissal by BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/8/2017. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Senter, Meghan) Modified on 1/13/2017 to edit docket text (bwn).
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/19/2017 10:00 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Counsel shall comply as stated herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 1/9/2017.(blg)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #89 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Magali Ann Puente-Martin for Genuine Parts Company. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk. (bwn)
January 5, 2017 Filing 89 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record by Genuine Parts Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brown, James)
January 4, 2017 Filing 88 ***DEFICIENT*** MOTION for Leave to File Third Party Demand by BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/4/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)Attorney Bradley Adam Hays added to party BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC(pty:dft).(Hays, Bradley) Modified on 1/5/2017 (bwn).
January 3, 2017 Filing 87 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #86 Proposed Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan - Document has been stricken pursuant to Rule 5(d) of the FRCP. (bwn)
January 3, 2017 Filing 86 **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RULE 5(D) OF THE FRCP** Proposed Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan by Genuine Parts Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Puente-Martin, Magali) Modified on 1/3/2017 (bwn).
January 3, 2017 Filing 85 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by General Electric Company (Brown, James)
December 29, 2016 Filing 84 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Genuine Parts Company identifying Corporate Parent Genuine Parts Company for Genuine Parts Company (Puente-Martin, Magali)
December 28, 2016 Filing 83 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #82 Statement of Corporate Disclosure - Document has been stricken pursuant to Rule 5(d) of the FRCP. (bwn)
December 28, 2016 Filing 82 **STRICKEN PURSUANT TO RULE 5(D) OF THE FRCP** Statement of Corporate Disclosure by BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC (Hays, Bradley) Modified on 12/28/2016 (bwn).
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #76 Motion to Dismiss and that all of plaintiffs' claims in the above-captioned matter against defendant Flowserve Corporation are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 12/21/2016. (bwn)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 80 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 6/22/2017 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. Counsel must immediately contact chambers with any conflicts. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 12/21/16.(clc)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED #55 MOTION for Partial Dismissal is GRANTED and that all of plaintiffs' claims against Huntington for pre-death loss of consortium, market share liability, enterprise liability, concert of action, punitive damages, and attorneys' fees are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 12/21/2016.(ajn)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/19/2017 10:00 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. All discovery must be completed by 5/22/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/6/2017 09:00 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Jury Trial set for 7/24/2017 08:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: Magistrate Judge)(blg)
December 20, 2016 Filing 77 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #76 Joint MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice - Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent motions are not set for submission. Clerk has removed submission date. (bwn)
December 20, 2016 Filing 76 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss without Prejudice by Flowserve US Inc., Nolan Legeaux and Susan Legeaux. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Swetman, Glenn) Modified on 12/20/2016 to edit filers and remove submission date (bwn).
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #73 Motion to Dismiss Party and #74 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Successor-by-Merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.) and Cleaver-Brooks Sales & Services, Inc. dismissed. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk. (bwn)
December 12, 2016 Filing 74 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc. by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Nolan Legeaux, and Susan Legeaux. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Strain, Stacey) Modified on 12/12/2016 to edit filers (bwn).
December 12, 2016 Filing 73 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party Cleaver-Brooks Sales and Service, Inc. Without Prejudice by Cleaver-Brooks Sales & Services, Inc., Nolan Legeaux, and Susan Legeaux. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Michael) Modified on 12/12/2016 to edit filers (bwn). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/12/2016) (bwn).
December 8, 2016 Filing 72 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2016 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (blg)
December 8, 2016 Filing 71 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lance M Africk: Docket Call held on 12/8/2016. SATISFIED as to the defendants, Cleaver-Brooks Sales & Services, Inc., DAP Products Inc., General Electric Company, IMO Industries, Inc., J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC and Huntington Ingalls, Inc. ORDERED that the defendants, Eagle, Inc. and Ingersoll-Rand Company are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Court Reporter Lanie Smith.) (blg)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #68 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 12/8/2016. (blg)
December 7, 2016 Filing 69 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #68 MOTION to Dismiss Party; Filing attorney did not select Nolan Legeaux and Susan Legeaux as a filers. Clerk added filers. Also, filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is 'Motion to Dismiss Party'. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. Also, the name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. No further action is necessary. (blg)
December 7, 2016 Filing 68 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Party J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. by J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc., Nolan Legeaux and Susan Legeaux. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moncla, Gayla) Modified on 12/7/2016 (blg).
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting #64 Motion to Dismiss and that all of plaintiffs' claims in the above-captioned matter against Caterpillar Inc. are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk. (bwn)
December 6, 2016 Filing 66 Response/Reply by J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. to #54 Order, Set Hearings (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Moncla, Gayla)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Dismiss Party, #58 Motion to Dismiss Party, #59 Motion to Dismiss Party, #60 Motion to Dismiss Party, #61 Motion to Dismiss Party, #62 Motion to Dismiss Party. Plaintiffs' claims in the above-captioned matter against defendants, Zurn Industries, LLC, Riley Power, Inc., DAP Products, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Warren Pumps LLC, and Crane Company are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 12/5/2016. (bwn)
December 5, 2016 Filing 64 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Caterpillar Inc, Nolan Legeaux and Susan Legeaux. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Emmett, Robert) Modified on 12/6/2016 to edit filers (bwn).
December 5, 2016 Filing 63 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by General Electric Company.(Brown, James)
December 5, 2016 Filing 62 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Crane Co. by Crane Company, Nolan Legeaux, and Susan Legeaux. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Campbell, Barry) Modified on 12/5/2016 to edit filers (bwn).
December 2, 2016 Filing 61 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Warren Pumps, LLC Without Prejudice by Warren Pumps, LLC., Nolan Legeaux and Susan Legeaux (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Waters, Lori) Modified on 12/5/2016 to edit filers (bwn).
December 2, 2016 Filing 60 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party IMO Industries, Inc. Without Prejudice by IMO Industries, Inc., Nolan Legeaux, and Susan Legeaux. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Waters, Lori) Modified on 12/5/2016 to edit filers (bwn).
December 2, 2016 Filing 59 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party DAP, Inc. Without Prejudice by DAP Products Inc., Susan Legeaux, and Nolan Legeaux. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Waters, Lori) Modified on 12/5/2016 to edit filers (bwn).
December 2, 2016 Filing 58 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party by Riley Power, Inc., Susan Legeaux, and Nolan Legeaux. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Franco, Jason) Modified on 12/2/2016 to edit filers (bwn).
December 2, 2016 Filing 57 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party by Zurn Industries, LLC, Susan Legeaux, and Nolan Legeaux. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Franco, Jason) Modified on 12/2/2016 to edit filers (bwn).
November 28, 2016 Filing 56 Response by Cleaver-Brooks Sales & Services, Inc. to Court's Request for Status Report (Document 54) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Barnes, Michael) Modified on 11/28/2016 to edit docket text (bwn).
November 16, 2016 Filing 55 MOTION to Dismiss Partial by Huntington Ingalls, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/14/2016. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission)(Shockey, Patrick) (Main Document 55 replaced on 11/17/2016) (bwn). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/17/2016: #2 Memorandum in Support) (bwn).
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER: Docket Call set for 12/8/2016 09:00 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 11/15/2016.(blg)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting #52 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew Scott Dillahunty. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 11/7/2016. (bwn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2016: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (bwn).
November 4, 2016 Filing 52 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Matthew Dillahunty (Fee previously paid) by Nolan Legeaux, Susan Legeaux. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit of Alex S. Dunn, Jr., #4 Affidavit of Matthew Dillahunty, #5 Electronic Case Filing Registration Form)(Dunn, Alex) Modified on 11/7/2016 to edit docket text (bwn). (Additional attachment(s)
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDERED that all of plaintiffs' claims in this matter against Western Oceanic Services, Inc. are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 11/2/2016.(blg)
October 31, 2016 Filing 50 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew Dillahunty (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 053L-5783433) by Nolan Legeaux, Susan Legeaux. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order regarding Pro Hac Vice for Matthew Dillahunty, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Alex S. Dunn, Jr. regarding Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Dillahunty, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Matthew Dillahunty regarding Pro Hac Vice, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing to be Filed with Pro Hac Vice for Matthew Dillahunty, #5 Supplement Electronic Case Filing System Attorney Registration Form)(Dunn, Alex) Modified on 11/1/2016 (clc).
October 31, 2016 Filing 49 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #48 MOTION to Withdraw Randy L. Gori as Attorney for Plaintiffs **Motion to Withdraw will be marked as Filed in Error, per filing attorney a Motion to Enroll Pro Hac Vice will be filed on behalf of Matthew S. Dillahunty. Randy L. Gori and James C. Ferrell will no longer appear on pleadings.** (clc)
October 28, 2016 Filing 48 **FILED IN ERROR** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Withdraw Randy L. Gori as Attorney for Plaintiffs by Nolan Legeaux, Susan Legeaux. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Withdraw Randy L. Gori from Case)(Dunn, Alex) Modified on 10/31/2016 (clc).
October 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Motion to Enroll as Additional Counsel of Record. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk. (bwn)
October 26, 2016 Filing 46 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record as Additional Counsel by BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Jeanette Seraile-Riggins added to party BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC(pty:dft).(Seraile-Riggins, Jeanette)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER AND REASONS re #40 Motion to Remand - IT IS ORDERED that the motion to remand is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no later than October 31, 2016, plaintiffs shall file a brief with the Court indicating whether they oppose dismissing Western Oceanic Services, Inc. If they do oppose dismissing Western Oceanic, then plaintiffs shallciting appropriate case lawexplain (1) how it is permissible to maintain Western Oceanic as a defendant in spite of Del. Code tit. 8, 278, and (2) whether a trustee must be appointed to maintain Western Oceanic as a defendant. If plaintiffs oppose dismissal, the removing defendants shall file a response by November 4, 2016. After considering the parties arguments, the Court will determine whether Western Oceanic should be dismissed. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk. (bwn)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER AND REASONS denying #37 Motion for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 10/14/16. (clc)
September 29, 2016 Filing 43 DEFICIENT: NOTICE of Appearance by Jeanette Seraile-Riggins on behalf of BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC. Attorney Jeanette Seraile-Riggins added to party BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC(pty:dft).(Seraile-Riggins, Jeanette) Modified on 9/30/2016 (blg).
September 27, 2016 Filing 42 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc., Vigor Industrial LLC, Vigor Shipyards, Inc. re #40 MOTION to Remand . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - July 1, 2016 Citation, #2 Exhibit B - Delaware SOS Printout, #3 Exhibit C - Letter to Clerk of Court, #4 Exhibit D - Documents Served on CTC, #5 Exhibit E - Tracking Information, #6 Exhibit F - Certificate of Dissolution, #7 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Michael Marsh, #8 Exhibit H - Affidavit of Roger Horne, #9 Exhibit I - Affidavit of Samuel Forman)(Dore, Philip)
September 27, 2016 Filing 41 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc., Todd Shipyards Corporation, Vigor Industrial LLC, Vigor Shipyards, Inc. re #37 MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amended Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dupard Deposition Excerpts)(Reagin, Patrick)
September 12, 2016 Filing 40 MOTION to Remand by Nolan Legeaux, Susan Legeaux. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/5/2016. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Proposed Order, #11 Notice of Submission)(Dunn, Alex)
September 9, 2016 Filing 39 Consent to Removal by BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC. (Massenburg, Christopher) Modified on 9/12/2016 (blg).
September 9, 2016 Filing 38 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Dunn, Alex)
September 9, 2016 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Nolan Legeaux, Susan Legeaux. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. Motion(s) will be submitted on 10/5/2016. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate, #5 Notice of Submission)(Dunn, Alex)
September 8, 2016 Filing 36 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC identifying Corporate Parent BorgWarner Inc. for BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC . (Massenburg, Christopher) Modified on 9/12/2016 (blg).
September 8, 2016 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher O. Massenburg on behalf of BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC. (Massenburg, Christopher) Modified on 9/12/2016 (blg).
September 8, 2016 Filing 34 ANSWER to Complaint by BorgWarner Morse TEC LLC. Attorney Christopher O. Massenburg added to party Borg-Warner Corporation(pty:dft).(Massenburg, Christopher) Modified on 9/12/2016 (blg).
September 8, 2016 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc., Vigor Industrial LLC, Vigor Shipyards, Inc..(Dore, Philip)
September 7, 2016 Filing 32 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Georgia-Pacific LLC (Rossi, Alexandra)
September 7, 2016 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by Georgia-Pacific LLC.(Rossi, Alexandra)
September 2, 2016 Filing 30 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Union Carbide Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Dow Chemical Company for Union Carbide Corporation (St. Julien, Milele)
September 2, 2016 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, by Union Carbide Corporation.(St. Julien, Milele)
August 31, 2016 Filing 28 Statement by Flowserve US Inc Corporate Disclosure (Swetman, Glenn)
August 31, 2016 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Flowserve US Inc. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(Swetman, Glenn)
August 29, 2016 Filing 26 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by CBS Corporation (Brown, James)
August 25, 2016 Filing 25 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Caterpillar Inc (Murphy, Stephanie)
August 25, 2016 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, by Caterpillar Inc.(Murphy, Stephanie)
August 25, 2016 Filing 23 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Zurn Industries, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Rexnord LLC for Zurn Industries, LLC . (Franco, Jason) Modified on 8/26/2016 (blg).
August 24, 2016 Filing 22 Notice of Compliance with LR 3.2 and 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) by Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc., Vigor Industrial LLC, Vigor Shipyards, Inc. re #4 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dore, Philip)
August 24, 2016 Filing 21 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by CertainTeed Corporation Inc. (Franco, Jason)
August 23, 2016 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, by CBS Corporation.(Brown, James)
August 23, 2016 Filing 19 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Georgia-Pacific LLC (Rossi, Alexandra)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #10 , #13 and #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Huntington Ingalls, Inc. answer due 9/8/2016; Georgia-Pacific LLC answer due 9/7/2016; J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc. answer due 9/7/2016. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 8/22/2016. (blg)
August 22, 2016 Filing 17 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ampco-Pittsburgh Corporation for Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Strain, Stacey)
August 19, 2016 Filing 16 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Cleaver-Brooks Sales & Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. for Cleaver-Brooks Sales & Services, Inc. (Barnes, Michael)
August 18, 2016 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Huntington Ingalls, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ellinghausen, Edwin)
August 18, 2016 Filing 14 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls, Inc. (Ellinghausen, Edwin)
August 17, 2016 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Georgia-Pacific LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rossi, Alexandra)
August 17, 2016 Filing 12 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Riley Power, Inc. (Franco, Jason)
August 17, 2016 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Riley Power, Inc..Attorney Jason P. Franco added to party Riley Power, Inc.(pty:dft).(Franco, Jason)
August 17, 2016 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Moncla, Gayla)
August 16, 2016 Filing 9 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Crane Company (Campbell, Barry)
August 16, 2016 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by Crane Company.(Campbell, Barry)
August 16, 2016 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Gardner Denver, Inc..(Matherne, James)
August 15, 2016 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc., Vigor Industrial LLC, Vigor Shipyards, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc. for Vigor Shipyards, Inc.; Corporate Parent Miles Marine, Inc. for Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc. (Dore, Philip)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc., Vigor Industrial LLC and Vigor Shipyards, Inc.; answer due 9/8/2016. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 8/12/2016. (blg)
August 15, 2016 Filing 4 Directive Pursuant to 28:1447(b) filed by Clerk. (blg)
August 12, 2016 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc., Vigor Industrial LLC, Vigor Shipyards, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dore, Philip)
August 11, 2016 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (jeg)
August 11, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2016-6048 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-5634467) filed by Vigor Shipyards, Inc., Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc., Vigor Industrial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Philip Dore added to party Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Philip Dore added to party Vigor Industrial LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Philip Dore added to party Vigor Shipyards, Inc.(pty:dft).(Dore, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Legeaux et al v. Borg-Warner Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nolan Legeaux
Represented By: Alex S. Dunn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Legeaux
Represented By: Alex S. Dunn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borg-Warner Corporation
Represented By: Christopher O. Massenburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Stacey Leigh Strain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caterpillar Inc
Represented By: Kimberly C. Delk
Represented By: Robert S. Emmett
Represented By: Stephanie Noriea Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Meredith K. Keenan
Represented By: Peter R. Tafaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CertainTeed Corporation Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Jason P. Franco
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: Arthur Wendel Stout, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks Sales & Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael R. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: Aleta W. Barnes
Represented By: Barry C. Campbell
Represented By: Hanson Douglas Horn
Represented By: Kevin M. Melchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAP Products Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Henry Hart, IV
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Leigh Ann Tschirn Schell
Represented By: Lori Allen Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc
Represented By: Heather Cheesbro
Represented By: Natasha Amber Corb
Represented By: Meaghan M. Donovan
Represented By: David R. Frohn
Represented By: B. Adam Hays
Represented By: Christopher O. Massenburg
Represented By: Meghan B. Senter
Represented By: Jeanette Seraile-Riggins
Represented By: Kevin R. Sloan
Represented By: Glenn L.M. Swetman
Represented By: Brandie Mendoza Thibodeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Daniel Rolando Estrada
Represented By: James Matthew Matherne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Meredith K. Keenan
Represented By: Peter R. Tafaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific LLC
Represented By: Sarah W. Anderson
Represented By: Gregory M. Anding
Represented By: Allison N. Benoit
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Barrye Panepinto Miyagi
Represented By: Gayla M. Moncla
Represented By: Alexandra E. Rossi
Represented By: Anthony M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Meredith K. Keenan
Represented By: Peter R. Tafaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Incorporated
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Henry Hart, IV
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Leigh Ann Tschirn Schell
Represented By: Lori Allen Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J-M Manufacturing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Gayla M. Moncla
Represented By: Alexandra E. Rossi
Represented By: Anthony M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Jason P. Franco
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: Arthur Wendel Stout, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Michael H. Abraham
Represented By: Melissa M. Desormeaux
Represented By: Deborah DeRoche Kuchler
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Henry Hart, IV
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Leigh Ann Tschirn Schell
Represented By: Lori Allen Waters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Jason P. Franco
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: Arthur Wendel Stout, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle A. Beaty
Represented By: Brian C. Bossier
Represented By: Erin Helen Boyd
Represented By: Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III
Represented By: Laura M. Gillen
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Grace, III
Represented By: Patrick Kevin Shockey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Oceanic Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puget Sound Commerce Center, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany L. Delery
Represented By: Philip Dore
Represented By: Patrick B. Reagin
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler
Represented By: Charles B. Wilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vigor Industrial LLC
Represented By: Tiffany L. Delery
Represented By: Philip Dore
Represented By: Patrick B. Reagin
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler
Represented By: Charles B. Wilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vigor Shipyards, Inc.
Represented By: Tiffany L. Delery
Represented By: Philip Dore
Represented By: Patrick B. Reagin
Represented By: Scott C. Seiler
Represented By: Charles B. Wilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?