Doe I et al v. Marine-Lombard
Plaintiff: Jane Doe I and Unidentified Parties
Defendant: Juana Marine-Lombard
Case Number: 2:2016cv14876
Filed: September 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER AND REASONS. It is ORDERED that Plaintiffs' 16 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Juana Marine-Lombard, in her official capacity as Commissioner, Louisiana Office of Alcohol and Tobacco Control, is ENJOINED from enforcing or causing any other state actor to enforce Act No. 395 anywhere within the State of Louisiana pending further Order of this Court. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (gec)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER AND REASONS denying 29 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on 11/10/16. (clc)
November 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 AMENDED ORDER & REASONS: Denying 12 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Juana Marine-Lombard as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 11/8/16.(sek)
November 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER & REASONS: denying 12 Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 11/4/16. (sek)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe I et al v. Marine-Lombard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe I
Represented By: Lindsay J. Calhoun
Represented By: Jeremy T. Grabill
Represented By: Harry Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juana Marine-Lombard
Represented By: Renee Gluth Culotta
Represented By: Elizabeth Harper Emmett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?