Nogess v. Poydras Center, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Michelle Nogess
Defendant: Poydras Center, LLC, Poydras Center Manager, Inc., Bobby Schloegel, The Travelers Insurance Company, Velocity Consulting, Inc. and Clampett Industries, L.L.C.
Third_party_defendant: Hertz Investment Group
Consol_plaintiff: Debra Ann Yates
Consol_defendant: Poydras Center, LLC, Poydras Center Manager, Inc., Bobby Schloegel, Travelers Casualty Company, Velocity Consulting, Inc. and Clampett Industries, L.L.C.
Consol_third_party_plaintiff: Velocity Consulting, Inc.
Consol_third_party_defendant: Hertz Investment Group
Case Number: 2:2016cv15227
Filed: October 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Presiding Judge: Jay C. Zainey
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that the 206 Motion for Entry of Rule 54(b) Final Judgment filed by Defendant Clampett Industries, LLC d/b/a EMG is GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 205 Motion for Entry of Final Judgment Regarding Summary Judgment in Favor of Velocity Consulting, Inc. filed by Defendant Velocity Consulting, Inc. is GRANTED, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 8/7/2018. (Reference: All Cases)(jls)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER granting 128 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Clampett Industrires, LLC d/b/a EMG; granting 129 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Velocity Consulting, Inc. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (Reference: both cases)(jrc)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER AND REASONS re 138 MOTION to Compel Independent Medical Exam of Plaintiff Without Audio Recording. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 3/6/2018.(Reference: Both Cases)(clc)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying 18 Motion to Remand to State Court; denying 67 Motion to Remand to State Court; denying 16 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey. (Reference: all cases)(jrc)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER AND REASONS - The Motion for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal (rec. doc. 38 ) is GRANTED and the amended Notice submitted as an attachment to that Motion (rec. doc. 38-5) will be filed into the record. The law firm Ungarino & Eckert is hereby SANCTIONED under Rule 11 for failure to conduct a reasonable inquiry under the circumstances prior to removing this case. No later than 15 DAYS after entry of this Order and Reasons, U&E is to pay to the Clerk of the Eastern District of Loui siana the sum of $4,500. It is further ORDERED that that the matter of additional discipline, if any, as to Matthew J. Ungarino is hereby referred by this Court to the Eastern District of Louisiana's Lawyers' Disciplinary Enforcement Committee for further investigation and proceedings and, if warranted, discipline. A copy of this Order and Reasons will be forwarded to that Committee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 1/27/2017. (CC: Louisiana's Lawyers' Disciplinary Enforcement Committee) (Reference: All Cases)(bwn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nogess v. Poydras Center, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Nogess
Represented By: George Brian Recile
Represented By: Barry William Sartin, Jr.
Represented By: James McClendon Williams
Represented By: Timothy J. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poydras Center, LLC
Represented By: David Joseph Bourgeois
Represented By: Guyton Henri Valdin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Poydras Center Manager, Inc.
Represented By: David Joseph Bourgeois
Represented By: Guyton Henri Valdin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Schloegel
Represented By: David Joseph Bourgeois
Represented By: Guyton Henri Valdin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Travelers Insurance Company
Represented By: David Joseph Bourgeois
Represented By: Guyton Henri Valdin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velocity Consulting, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Ungarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clampett Industries, L.L.C.
Represented By: E. Stuart Ponder
Represented By: Michael J. Vondenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: Hertz Investment Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Debra Ann Yates
Represented By: Vincent James Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Poydras Center, LLC
Represented By: David Joseph Bourgeois
Represented By: Guyton Henri Valdin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Poydras Center Manager, Inc.
Represented By: David Joseph Bourgeois
Represented By: Guyton Henri Valdin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Bobby Schloegel
Represented By: David Joseph Bourgeois
Represented By: Guyton Henri Valdin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Travelers Casualty Company
Represented By: David Joseph Bourgeois
Represented By: Guyton Henri Valdin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Velocity Consulting, Inc.
Represented By: David Ira Bordelon
Represented By: Matthew J. Ungarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_defendant: Clampett Industries, L.L.C.
Represented By: David Joseph Bourgeois
Represented By: Guyton Henri Valdin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_third_party_plaintiff: Velocity Consulting, Inc.
Represented By: David Ira Bordelon
Represented By: Matthew J. Ungarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_third_party_defendant: Hertz Investment Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?