Gahagan v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Plaintiff: Michael W. Gahagan
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 2:2016cv15438
Filed: October 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Martin L.C. Feldman
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that the 75 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS is REJECTED in part and ADOPTED in part. FURTHER ORDERED that 43 Motion for Attorney's Fees is DENIED, but his request for costs is GRANTED. Mr. Gahagan is entitled to recover $451.47 in costs. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman.(cml)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED: that 45 USCIS's motion for reconsideration is DENIED and its 44 motion for summary judgment is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED: that the scheduling order issued in this case is hereby rescinded and a judgment for plaintiff will be entered. Finally, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED: that the plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees is referred to the magistrate judge for determination. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 3/8/2017. (cg)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER AND REASONS finding as moot 6 Motion for Summary Judgment as per herein. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 12/22/2016. (cg)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that the plaintiff' s 6 Motion for Summary Judgment in GRANTED in part in so far as the Court finds that the USCIS's search for the requested record was inadequate. FURTHER ORDERED that another search of the C LAIMS system shall be conducted and, within five days, counsel for USCIS shall submit supplemental papers and a supplemental declaration as further explained in document. FURTHER ORDERED that not later than 5:00 p.m. twenty-four hours from receipt of this Order and Reasons, counsel for USCIS shall produce to the plaintiff the unredacted recreated Receipt Notice and shall certify compliance in the record. FURTHER ORDERED that the remaining issue raised by the plaintiff's motion for summary is under submission pending USCIS's forthcoming submission. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 12/14/16. (clc)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gahagan v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Gahagan
Represented By: Michael Wayne Gahagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?