Wright v. National Interstate Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Tonja R. Wright
Defendant: National Interstate Insurance Company, Mabe Trucking Company, Inc., Terry Tearle Poole and Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv16214
Filed: November 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Tangipahoa
Presiding Judge: Eldon E. Fallon
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER AND REASONS that Plaintiff's 169 Motion for New Trial is hereby DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Allstate's 171 Motion to Alter Judgment is hereby GRANTED. The judgment (Rec. Doc. 167) is hereby AMENDED to dismiss Defendant Allstate from any claim of damages. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/30/2018. (cms)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER AND REASONS granting 36 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/6/2017. (cms)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER AND REASONS that all motions 38 , 43 , 45 , 46 are hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/12/2017. (cms)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER AND REASONS denying 32 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine; granting 21 Defendant's Motion in Limine, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 8/25/2017. (jls)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND REASONS that Plaintiff's 8 Motion to Remand, is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/24/2017. (cms)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. National Interstate Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonja R. Wright
Represented By: Roderick Alvendia
Represented By: Jeanne K. Demarest
Represented By: Amy Collins Fontenot
Represented By: John Bartholomew Kelly, III
Represented By: Kurt A. Offner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Interstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Nathan M. Gaudet
Represented By: Mitchell D. Monsour, Jr.
Represented By: Guy D. Perrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mabe Trucking Company, Inc.
Represented By: Nathan M. Gaudet
Represented By: Mitchell D. Monsour, Jr.
Represented By: Guy D. Perrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Tearle Poole
Represented By: Nathan M. Gaudet
Represented By: Mitchell D. Monsour, Jr.
Represented By: Guy D. Perrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: David Henry Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?