Global Oil Tools, Inc. v. Expeditors International of Washington, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Global Oil Tools, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Expeditors International of Washington, Inc. and Zurich American Insurance Company |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv16372 |
Filed: |
November 15, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana |
Office: |
New Orleans Office |
County: |
Terrebonne |
Presiding Judge: |
Janis van Meerveld |
Presiding Judge: |
Sarah S. Vance |
Nature of Suit: |
Marine |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1333 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 11, 2019 |
Filing
205
ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that Hapag-Lloyd's Motion to dismiss Expeditors' crossclaims (Rec. Doc. 171 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Hapag-Lloyd's Motion to dismiss crossclaims of Merzario (Rec. Doc. 171 ) is GRANTED as unopposed, and those claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Hapag-Lloyd's Motion for partial summary judgment to limit recoverable damages (Rec. Doc. 171 ) on Expeditors' claim against it is GRANTED. IT IS FURT HER ORDERED Expeditors' Motion to dismiss the Plaintiff's claims (Rec. Doc. 195 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Zurich's Motion for summary judgment (Rec. Doc. 172 ) is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's claims against Zur ich related to an alleged first-party cargo insurance policy are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Expeditor's Motion for partial summary judgment to limit Plaintiff's recovery to $500 per package (Rec. Doc. 120 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 6/10/2019. (sa)
|
April 2, 2018 |
Filing
113
ORDER AND REASONS granting 54 , 88 Motions for Summary Judgment. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Hapag-Lloyd's and Ports America's motions for summary judgment. Plaintiff's claims against Hapag-Lloyd and Ports America are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Expeditors' and Andrea Merzario's crossclaims against Ports America are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 4/2/2018. (cg)
|
January 2, 2018 |
Filing
85
ORDER AND REASONS denying 70 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/2/2018. (cg)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?