Leech et al v. 3M Company et al

Plaintiff: Margaret A. Leech, Thomas Leech and Sarah Leech
Defendant: 3M Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Anco Insulations, Inc., Calaveras Asbestos Ltd., CBS Corporation, Certainteed Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, Georgia Pacific LLC, Goulds Pumps LLC, Grinnell LLC, Hajoca Corp, Honeywell International, Inc., IMO Industries Inc., Santa Fe Braun Inc, Taylor Seidenbach, Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Autoliv ASP Inc, Morton Salt, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Dow Chemical Company, Rohm & Haas, McCarty Corporation and JM Manufacturing
Case Number: 2:2017cv00446
Filed: January 19, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.'s 126 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/29/2018. (mmv)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Honeywell International Inc.'s 114 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/15/2018. (mmv)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Rohm and Haas Chemicals LLC's 82 Motion for Dismissal Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2), Alternatively Motion for More Definite Statement Pursuant to Rule 12(e) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDE RED that Plaintiffs are granted 30 days to conduct jurisdictionaldiscovery. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs are granted 60 days to file an amended complaint to address the deficiencies raised above, if appropriate. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 3/23/2018. (mmv)
September 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER denying 42 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/29/17. (jrc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leech et al v. 3M Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret A. Leech
Represented By: Lindsey A. Cheek
Represented By: Patrick Jonathan O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Leech
Represented By: Lindsey A. Cheek
Represented By: Patrick Jonathan O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Leech
Represented By: Lindsey A. Cheek
Represented By: Patrick Jonathan O'Hara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3M Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Stacey Leigh Strain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anco Insulations, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calaveras Asbestos Ltd.
Represented By: Georgia Noble Ainsworth
Represented By: Kay Barnes Baxter
Represented By: Margaret Adams Casey
Represented By: Martin James Dempsey, Jr.
Represented By: Ashley A. Edwards
Represented By: Jason K. Elam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certainteed Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer E. Adams
Represented By: Jason P. Franco
Represented By: William Claudy Harrison, Jr.
Represented By: Barbara Bourgeois Ormsby
Represented By: Arthur Wendel Stout, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Peter R. Tafaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific LLC
Represented By: Sarah W. Anderson
Represented By: Gregory M. Anding
Represented By: Allison N. Benoit
Represented By: Robert E. Dille
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Barrye Panepinto Miyagi
Represented By: Gayla M. Moncla
Represented By: Alexandra E. Rossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hajoca Corp
Represented By: Georgia Noble Ainsworth
Represented By: Kay Barnes Baxter
Represented By: Margaret Adams Casey
Represented By: Martin James Dempsey, Jr.
Represented By: Ashley A. Edwards
Represented By: Jason K. Elam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth McMillan
Represented By: Eric Shuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Henry Hart, IV
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Represented By: Leigh Ann Tschirn Schell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Fe Braun Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Seidenbach, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Autoliv ASP Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morton Salt, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jay Morton Jalenak, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick Dale Roquemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rohm & Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JM Manufacturing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?