Cajun Services Unlimited LLC v. Benton Energy Service Company, et al
Plaintiff: |
Cajun Services Unlimited, LLC |
Defendant: |
Benton Energy Service Company and Elite Energy Services, LLC |
Counter_claimant: |
Benton Energy Service Company |
Counter_defendant: |
Cajun Services Unlimited, LLC |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv00491 |
Filed: |
January 20, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana |
Office: |
New Orleans Office |
County: |
Terrebonne |
Presiding Judge: |
Jay C. Zainey |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph C. Wilkinson |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 Fed. Question: Trademark |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 9, 2021 |
Filing
397
ORDER & REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that Cajun's 281 application for appellate attorney's fees is GRANTED and the amount of the fee award is fixed as $107,851.60. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 12/9/2021.(Reference: All Cases)(pp)
|
June 15, 2020 |
Filing
368
ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that Besco's 314 motion for post-trial relief on Plaintiffs' patent-infringement claim is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Besco's 315 motion for post-trial relief on fraud and LUTPA claims is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Besco's 316 motion for post-trial relief on trade-secret misappropriation and breach-of-contract claims is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Besco's 317 Rule 59 motion for new trial / alter / amend / for remittitur on damages a ward to Plaintiffs is GRANTED IN PART in that the 312 final judgment is hereby amended to delete the phrase for diverted rentals from paragraph 5, and an Amended Final Judgment will be issued reflecting such amendment. Besco's motion is DENIED in all other respects. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' 318 motion to alter the judgment with respect to the scope of injunction is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Besco's 319 motion to stay execution of judgment is GRANTED. Execution of judgment is stayed through 30 days from the entry of the Amended Final Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' 320 motion for writ of execution and/or writ of fieri facias is DENIED. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 6/15/2020. (Reference: All Cases)(clc)
|
January 23, 2020 |
Filing
309
ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for attorney's fees, litigation expenses, costs, and prejudgment interest (R. Doc. 281 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 01/23/2020. (Reference: All Cases)(am)
|
November 19, 2019 |
Filing
297
ORDER AND REASONS: DENYING 279 Motion to Compel Arbitration, as stated herein. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 11/19/2019. (Reference: All Cases)(am)
|
June 7, 2019 |
Filing
241
ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that Besco's Motions for partial summary judgment to dismiss Cajun's breach-of-contract claim (Rec. Doc. 218 ), to dismiss Plaintiffs' trade-secrets claims (Rec. Doc. 216 ), and to dismiss Cajun's patent-infringement claim (Rec. Doc. 219 ) are DENIED, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 6/7/2019. (Reference: All Cases)(sa)
|
May 23, 2019 |
Filing
240
ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss (Rec. Doc. 170 , Case No. 17-491), filed on behalf of Plaintiffs, is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Besco's Second Counterclaim asserted in civil action no. 18-5932 is dismissed with prejudice as to any claims for invalidity on grounds other than inventorship. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 5/23/2019. (Reference: 18-5932)(sa)
|
April 3, 2019 |
Filing
205
ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that 142 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed on behalf of Cajun Services Unlimited, d/b/a Spoked Manufacturing, is GRANTED in part, insofar as it seeks dismissal of the claims asserted by Benton Energ y Service Company, d/b/a Besco Tubular, in civil action no. 18-5630, and DISMISSED in part as premature, insofar as it seeks an exceptional-case determination and attorney's fees, without prejudice to Cajun's right to seek such a determinat ion and fees following final disposition of this consolidated case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all claims of Benton Energy Service Company, d/b/a Besco Tubular, in civil action no. 18-5630, are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, but without prejudice to Besco's right to pursue similar claims asserted as counterclaims in civil action no. 18-5932. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 4/3/2019. (Reference: All Cases)(sa)
|
May 8, 2018 |
Filing
132
ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's 107 Motion in Limine is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth in document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's motion seeking to exclude Bryce Hall as a witness is DISMISSED as moot. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 5/7/2018. (ajn)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?