Moore v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al
Plaintiff: |
Robert L Moore |
Defendant: |
Toyota Motor Corporation, Takata Corporation, TK Holdings, Inc. and Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv01379 |
Filed: |
February 15, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana |
Office: |
New Orleans Office |
County: |
Orleans |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael North |
Presiding Judge: |
Sarah S. Vance |
Nature of Suit: |
Motor Vehicle Product Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 14, 2019 |
Filing
119
ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that the Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 98 ) is GRANTED, and all of the claims of plaintiff, Robert L. Moore against Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc., Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., and Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 3/14/2019. (sa)
|
August 15, 2018 |
Filing
102
ORDER AND REASONS denying 99 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 8/15/2018. (cg)
|
November 20, 2017 |
Filing
74
ORDER AND REASONS granting 31 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 53 Motion to Strike. For the foregoing reasons, plaintiff's motion to strike is DENIED, except as to the affidavit of Debra Hatton. The Court DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE any Louisiana Products Liability Act claims against Toyota Motor Sales, Toyota Motor Corporation, and Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America to the extent such claims are predicated on the allegation that these defendants continued to use Takata airbags, knowing of the safety concerns of Takata airbags and inflators, and failed to warn consumers about these dangers. Further, the Court DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE all causes of action except those arising under the Louisiana Products Liab ility Act, including claims of negligence, intentional tort, breach of contract, breach of warranty, negligent misrepresentation, fraud, and bad faith, as to Toyota Motor Sales, Toyota Motor Corporation, and Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/20/2017. (cg)
|
November 13, 2017 |
Filing
73
ORDER regarding 32 and 45 Motions to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. For the foregoing reasons, Toyota Motor Corporation's motion is granted in part. IT IS ORDERED that plaintiff serve process on Toyota Motor Corporation within 60 days of this order. Toyoda Gosei's motion is granted. Plaintiff's claims against Toyoda Gosei are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 11/13/2017. (cg)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?