Cox Operating, L.L.C. v. Settoon Towing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cox Operating, L.L.C.
Defendant: Settoon Towing, LLC, Megan B. Settoon M/V, Barge SMI-245 and Unidentified Parties
Case Number: 2:2017cv01933
Filed: March 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Kurt D. Engelhardt
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 33:2701
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER AND REASONS denying 99 Motion for an adverse inference at trial. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 8/27/2018. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER AND REASONS deferring ruling on until trial 90 Motion in Limine to exclude evidence of other accidents. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 8/15/2018. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that Settoon's 89 motion is GRANTED IN PART and DEFERRED IN PART as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 8/13/2018. (Reference: All Cases)(mmv)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER AND REASONS re 76 Motion in Limine to exclude certain evidence; ORDERED that Cox's request to exclude evidence based on Settoon experts' post-allision inspections of Quarantine Bay is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Cox's requ est to exclude the statements allegedly made by Captain Fontaine to Captain Fazioli on 3/30/2018 is DEFERRED until trial. FURTHER ORDERED that Cox's request to exclude evidence that it engaged a third-party contractor to inspect its navigation aid lights is DENIED. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 6/26/2018. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER AND REASONS denying 64 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; dismissing as moot 74 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 6/7/2018. (Reference: ALL CASES)(blg)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER AND REASONS denying 34 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 5/31/2018. (Reference: 17-1933)(blg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox Operating, L.L.C. v. Settoon Towing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Operating, L.L.C.
Represented By: Robert Clotworthy
Represented By: Christopher Matthew Hannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Settoon Towing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Megan B. Settoon M/V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barge SMI-245
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?