Robert Beard, et al v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Plaintiff: Robert Beard, Carolyn Milton, Garry Lewis and Livingston Town, LA
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Case Number: 2:2017cv02668
Filed: March 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Livingston
Presiding Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the USACE has complied with its FOIA obligations and the documents listed on the Vaughn indices were properly withheld. If plaintiffs intend to file a Motion for attorneys' fees, they must set such motion for hearing no later than December 19, 2018. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 10/30/2018.(sa)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 33 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to the requested relief of ordering the defendant to produce the withheld documents for an ex parte in camera inspection. The motion is otherwise DENIED. I T IS FURTHER ORDERED that 34 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to the requested relief of the court conducting an ex parte in camera inspection of the withheld documents. The motion is otherwise DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defe ndant produce the withheld documents to the court for an ex parte in camera inspection within 15 days of the date of this Order. The court will then determine whether the documents were properly withheld pursuant to the claimed FOIA exemptions. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 6/13/2018. (ajn)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER AND REASONS that Defendant's 25 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' 26 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to the requested relief of ordering the defendant to produce a supplemental Vaughn Index. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendant produce an amended Vaughn index within 30 days of the date of this order as stated herein. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 3/1/2018. (cms)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Beard, et al v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Beard
Represented By: Antonio M. Clayton
Represented By: Joshua M. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Milton
Represented By: Antonio M. Clayton
Represented By: Joshua M. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garry Lewis
Represented By: Antonio M. Clayton
Represented By: Joshua M. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Livingston Town, LA
Represented By: Antonio M. Clayton
Represented By: Joshua M. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?