Buckenberger v. Milazzo
Plaintiff: Christopher Buckenberger
Defendant: Jane Triche Milazzo, Unidentified Parties and Gerald J. Neilsen
Movant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2017cv02862
Filed: April 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: West Feliciana
Presiding Judge: Ivan L.R. Lemelle
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that the 20 Motion to Amend/Correct is DENIED, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 10/4/2017. (jls)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER AND JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that there be judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff, dismissing Plaintiff's claims in the above-captioned matter with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1). Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 6/13/2017.(mmv)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that 6 MOTION to Set Aside is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 7 MOTION to Remand is DISMISSED as frivolous. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Christopher Buckenberger show cause in writing no later than M onday, 6/5/2017 why this matter should not be dismissed as frivolous and otherwise barred by judicial immunity. Failure to timely comply with this Order may lead to additional grounds for dismissal without further notice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 5/24/2017.(ajn) .
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckenberger v. Milazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Buckenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Triche Milazzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald J. Neilsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: United States of America
Represented By: Peter M. Mansfield(Designation Assistant U.S. Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?