Brothers Petroleum, LLC v. Wagners Chef, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Brothers Petroleum, LLC |
Defendant: |
Wagners Chef, LLC, Jadallah Enterprises, LLC, Ahmed 1, LLC, First NBC Bank, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Empire Express, LLC and Wagner World, LLC |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv06713 |
Filed: |
July 13, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana |
Office: |
New Orleans Office |
County: |
Jefferson |
Presiding Judge: |
Carl Barbier |
Presiding Judge: |
Janis van Meerveld |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
12 U.S.C. ยง 1819 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 1, 2020 |
Filing
162
ORDER AND REASONS granting 143 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is awarded $73,080 in attorney's fees and $5,788.18 in costs against Defendants Wagners Chef, LLC, Jadallah Enterprises, LLC, and Ahmed 1, LLC. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 7/1/20. (cg)
|
June 26, 2020 |
Filing
159
ORDER & REASONS. It is ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Rec. Doc. 147 ) is DENIED as stated within document. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (gec)
|
October 16, 2018 |
Filing
58
ORDER AND REASONS denying 47 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 10/15/2018. (cg)
|
July 31, 2018 |
Filing
46
ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that LNV's Motion to Dismiss (Rec. Doc. 20) pursuant to 12(b)(1) is GRANTED and LNV is dismissed as a party to these proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motions to Dismiss submitted by Defendants Wagner World, LLC (Rec. Doc. 21); and Empire Express, LLC (Rec. Doc. 22) are GRANTED and that Wagner World and Empire Express are dismissed as parties to these proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss submitted by Defendants, Jad allah Enterprises, LLC and Ahmed 1, LLC, jointly, (Rec. Doc. 18) is GRANTED IN PART to dismiss with prejudice the revocatory actions asserted against Defendants; DENIED IN PART as to Brothers' claims against Jadallah Enterprises and Ahmed 1 for unfair trade practices; and GRANTED IN PART to dismiss with prejudice Brothers' claims against Jadallah Enterprises and Ahmed 1 for unjust enrichment. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 7/31/2018. (cg)
|
August 30, 2017 |
Filing
9
ORDER & REASONS. It is ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Stay (Rec. Doc. 3 ) is GRANTED for 180-days from the filing of Brothers Petroleum's administrative claim or until the FDIC denies Brothers Petroleum's claims for administrative relief, whichever occurs first. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier. (gec)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Brothers Petroleum, LLC v. Wagners Chef, LLC et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Brothers Petroleum, LLC |
Represented By: |
Joseph Vincent DiRosa, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Wagners Chef, LLC |
Represented By: |
Thomas Matthew Beh |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Jadallah Enterprises, LLC |
Represented By: |
Thomas Matthew Beh |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Ahmed 1, LLC |
Represented By: |
Thomas Matthew Beh |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: First NBC Bank |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation |
Represented By: |
William David Aaron, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Anna A. Rainer |
Represented By: |
DeWayne Larry Williams |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Empire Express, LLC |
Represented By: |
Kyle S. Sclafani |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Wagner World, LLC |
Represented By: |
Bradley Aldrich |
Represented By: |
Seth Joseph Smiley |
Represented By: |
John Matthew Thomas |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?