Angelle v. Spartan Offshore Drilling LLC
Plaintiff: Peter Angelle
Defendant: Spartan Offshore Drilling, LLC and Gordon Reed & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv07707
Filed: August 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: Kurt D. Engelhardt
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER AND REASONS DENYING 58 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/31/2019. (jeg)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that the clerk of court designate this action as a non-jury trial. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/25/2019.(jeg)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER AND REASONS: This motion is unopposed, and, further, it appearing to the court that the motion has merit, IT IS ORDERED that the 42 motion is GRANTED as set forth in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 5/6/2019. (mmv)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER & REASONS that defendant Gordon Reed & Associates, Inc.'s 15 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and all claims against said defendant are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 6/18/18. (dno)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angelle v. Spartan Offshore Drilling LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Angelle
Represented By: Blaine James Barrilleaux
Represented By: Paul M. Sterbcow
Represented By: Ian F. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spartan Offshore Drilling, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Reed & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?