CEH Energy, LLC, et al v. Kean Miller LLP et al
Plaintiff: CEH Energy, LLC and Shenzen Careall Investment Holdings Group Co., Ltd.
Defendant: Kean Miller LLP and Stephen C. Hanemann
Case Number: 2:2017cv08274
Filed: August 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of Country
Presiding Judge: Eldon E. Fallon
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER AND REASONS that Plaintiffs' second 61 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' 60 Motion to Amend Complaint is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' 62 Motion to Amend/Correct their Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/28/2018. (cms)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER & REASONS that Plaintiff's 47 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/7/2018. (cms)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER & REASONS that Stephen C. Hanemann's 27 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Kean Miller LLP's 29 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim are GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims against Stephen Hanemann and Kean Miller are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 11/20/17. (dno)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CEH Energy, LLC, et al v. Kean Miller LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kean Miller LLP
Represented By: Connell Lee Archey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen C. Hanemann
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CEH Energy, LLC
Represented By: Dan Stewart Boyd
Represented By: Elliot V Haller
Represented By: William H Hussey
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shenzen Careall Investment Holdings Group Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Dan Stewart Boyd
Represented By: Elliot V Haller
Represented By: William H Hussey
Represented By: Andrew K. Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?