Singleton et al v. Cannizzaro et al
Plaintiff: Renata Singleton, Marc Mitchell, Lazonia Baham, Tiffany LaCroix, Fayona Bailey, Silence Is Violence and Unidentified Party
Defendant: Leon A Cannizzaro, Jr, David Pipes, Iain Dover, Jason Napoli, Arthur Mitchell, Tiffany Tucker, Michael Trummel, Inga Petrovich, Laura Rodrigue, Matthew Hamilton and Unidentified Party
Case Number: 2:2017cv10721
Filed: October 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER AND REASONS: DENYING 201 Motion for Separate Trials, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 7/17/2020. (am)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER AND REASONS: GRANTING 159 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 6/8/2020. (am)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER AND REASONS: Granting 162 Motion to Quash the Individual Defendants Subpoena to Dr. Ronald McClendon, Jr. as set forth in document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 1/23/2020. (ajn)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER AND REASONS DENYING 121 MOTION to Confirm Stay of Proceedings; DENYING 141 MOTION for Indicative Ruling Pursuant to Rule 62.1, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 07/02/2019. (am)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER AND REASONS: Before the Court is Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 63). For the following reasons, the Motion is GRANTED IN PART. Plaintiffs' claims not specifically set forth in the document are hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 2/28/2019. (mm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singleton et al v. Cannizzaro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renata Singleton
Represented By: Anna Marie Arceneaux
Represented By: Katherine Ashworth Chamblee-Ryan
Represented By: Bruce W. Hamilton
Represented By: Alec George Karakatsanis
Represented By: Somil Bharat Trivedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Mitchell
Represented By: Anna Marie Arceneaux
Represented By: Katherine Ashworth Chamblee-Ryan
Represented By: Bruce W. Hamilton
Represented By: Alec George Karakatsanis
Represented By: Somil Bharat Trivedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lazonia Baham
Represented By: Anna Marie Arceneaux
Represented By: Katherine Ashworth Chamblee-Ryan
Represented By: Bruce W. Hamilton
Represented By: Alec George Karakatsanis
Represented By: Somil Bharat Trivedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany LaCroix
Represented By: Anna Marie Arceneaux
Represented By: Katherine Ashworth Chamblee-Ryan
Represented By: Bruce W. Hamilton
Represented By: Alec George Karakatsanis
Represented By: Somil Bharat Trivedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fayona Bailey
Represented By: Anna Marie Arceneaux
Represented By: Katherine Ashworth Chamblee-Ryan
Represented By: Bruce W. Hamilton
Represented By: Alec George Karakatsanis
Represented By: Somil Bharat Trivedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silence Is Violence
Represented By: Anna Marie Arceneaux
Represented By: Katherine Ashworth Chamblee-Ryan
Represented By: Bruce W. Hamilton
Represented By: Alec George Karakatsanis
Represented By: Somil Bharat Trivedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unidentified Party
Represented By: Anna Marie Arceneaux
Represented By: Katherine Ashworth Chamblee-Ryan
Represented By: Bruce W. Hamilton
Represented By: Alec George Karakatsanis
Represented By: Somil Bharat Trivedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon A Cannizzaro, Jr
Represented By: W. Raley Alford, III
Represented By: Thomas Jeffrey Barbera
Represented By: Matthew J. Paul
Represented By: Richard C. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Pipes
Represented By: W. Raley Alford, III
Represented By: Matthew J. Paul
Represented By: Richard C. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iain Dover
Represented By: W. Raley Alford, III
Represented By: Matthew J. Paul
Represented By: Richard C. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Napoli
Represented By: W. Raley Alford, III
Represented By: Matthew J. Paul
Represented By: Richard C. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Mitchell
Represented By: W. Raley Alford, III
Represented By: Matthew J. Paul
Represented By: Richard C. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Tucker
Represented By: W. Raley Alford, III
Represented By: Matthew J. Paul
Represented By: Richard C. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Trummel
Represented By: W. Raley Alford, III
Represented By: Matthew J. Paul
Represented By: Richard C. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inga Petrovich
Represented By: W. Raley Alford, III
Represented By: Matthew J. Paul
Represented By: Richard C. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Rodrigue
Represented By: W. Raley Alford, III
Represented By: Matthew J. Paul
Represented By: Richard C. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Hamilton
Represented By: W. Raley Alford, III
Represented By: Matthew J. Paul
Represented By: Richard C. Stanley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?