Morris v. New Orleans City

Plaintiff: Neal Morris
Defendant: New Orleans City
Case Number: 2:2018cv02624
Filed: March 13, 2018
Court: Louisiana Eastern District Court
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Orleans
Presiding Judge: Martin L.C. Feldman
Referring Judge: Joseph C. Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2018 67 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute Order. Proceedings held before Judge Martin L.C. Feldman: A status conference was held on December 13, 2018., 2014. ORDERED that the pre- rial and trial schedule of this matter is hereby continued, to be reset during a telephone scheduling c onference on Friday, December 14, 2018 at 10:00 a.m. FURTHER ORDERED that the City is admonished to act as efficiently and as quickly as possible, given its time constraints in amending city laws, in presenting a new Ordinance which the City feels addresses the issues in this case. FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to stay filed by the City is hereby DENIEDas moot. (clc)
October 18, 2018 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that the plaintiff's 48 Motion to Strike is GRANTED, and the defendant's 38 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part, as to the plaintiff's class of one Equal Protection claim under the Fourteenth Amendment, and DENIED in part, as to the plaintiff's claim that § 21.6.V constitutes an unconstitutional content-based regulation and prior restraint of speech in violation of the First Amendment, as well as to the plaintiff's Due Process claim and facial challenge under the Equal Protection Clause of the Fourteenth Amendment. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 10/18/18. (clc)
April 9, 2018 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REASONS DENYING 11 Second MOTION to Continue Submission date of Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction filed by New Orleans City. FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing on the plaintiff's 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is hereby continued to May 16, 2018. Any opposition papers must be filed by the City not later than May 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 4/9/2018.(clc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. New Orleans City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neal Morris
Represented By: Bruce W. Hamilton
Represented By: Ronald Lawrence Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans City
Represented By: Rebecca H. Dietz
Represented By: Mary Katherine Kaufman
Represented By: Cherrell Simms Taplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?