Fucich Contracting, Inc. v. Shread-Kuyrkendall and Associates, Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Fucich Contracting, Inc.
Defendant: Shread-Kuyrkendall & Associates, Inc., Unidentified Party, St. Bernard Parish and XL Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv02885
Filed: March 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Office: New Orleans Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susie Morgan
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the 464 Motion to Quash the Notice of Corporate Deposition of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America with Incorporated Requests for Production of Documents is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby on November 4, 2020. (mp)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 463 MINUTE ENTRY & ORDER for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby: Motion Hearing held on 10/14/2020 re 447 Motion to Quash Notice of Video Deposition. IT IS ORDERED that the 447 Motion to Quash is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as detailed herein. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (Court Reporter Cathy Pepper.) (mp)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER AND REASONS: DENYING 423 Motion to Bifurcate, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 09/02/2020. (am)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER AND REASONS denying 417 Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b). Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 6/3/2020. (clc)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 416 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that Philadelphia Gear's 390 motion to dismiss is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 4/24/2020. (clc)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER AND REASONS: IT IS ORDERED that Philadelphia Gear's motions to dismiss (R. Docs. 315 & 316 ) are GRANTED and SKAs third-party claim is hereby dismissed. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 12/17/2019. (am)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that FCI's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 51 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that FCI's Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Rec. Doc. 181 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 8/20/2019. (sa)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, Rec. Doc. 244 . IT IS ORDERED that the Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreements (Rec. Doc. 195 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 6/24/2019.(sa)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that Travelers' application for preliminary injunction (Rec. Doc. 140 ) is GRANTED in part. However, the Court reserves decision on the amount of collateral sufficient to discharge Travelers' loss or antic ipated loss, so no preliminary injunction will issue until the amount of collateral the Indemnitors are to provide is determined. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Travelers shall file a memorandum, which is to address the amount of collateral sufficient to discharge its loss or anticipated loss, NO LATER THAN Wednesday, May 1, 2019, and that the Indemnitors shall file a memorandum in response NO LATER THAN Wednesday, May 15, 2019. The Court shall hear ARGUMENT on this issue on Friday, May 17, 2019, at 9:00 a.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that FCI's motion for preliminary injunction (Rec. Doc. 119 ) and the Indemnitors' application for a preliminary injunction (Rec. Doc. 157 ) are DENIED insofar as they seek to enjoin Travelers from exercis ing its right to demand collateral under the Indemnity Agreement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Indemnitors' motion to expedite hearing on their application for preliminary injunction (Rec. Doc. 159 ), having been effectively granted by the Court in holding the January 9, 2019 hearing, is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 4/19/2019. (NEF: Mag. 4)(sa)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that Defendant St. Bernard Parish's 53 motion to continue and request for additional discovery be and hereby is GRANTED. Plaintiff Fucich Contracting, Inc.'s 51 motion for partial summary judgment shal l be submitted on Wednesday, October 31, 2018 to allow time for additional discovery. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant St. Bernard Parish's opposition to Plaintiff FCI's motion for partial summary judgment be filed by no later than Tuesday, October 23, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant St. Bernard Parish's 54 motion to expedite be and hereby is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan. (bwn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fucich Contracting, Inc. v. Shread-Kuyrkendall and Associates, Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fucich Contracting, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Francis Gardner
Represented By: Douglas A. Kewley
Represented By: William Lee Kohler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shread-Kuyrkendall & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Bernard Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?